EP3515001 - USER TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEDA, Kazuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
YASUKAWA, Shinpei c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
WANG, Lihui c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co. Ltd. 7/F Raycom Infotech Park TowerA No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 17850961.8 | 14.09.2017 | [2019/30] | WO2017JP33206 | Priority number, date | JP20160182134 | 16.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016182134 | [2019/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018052060 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3515001 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L29/08, H04W28/04 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
H04L1/1845 (EP,KR);
H04L1/0068 (US);
H04L1/0045 (KR);
H04L1/18 (US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L1/1854 (KR);
H04L1/1887 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L65/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Title | German: | BENUTZERENDGERÄT UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2019/30] | English: | USER TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2019/30] | French: | TERMINAL D'UTILISATEUR, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2019 | Translation filed | 28.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 17.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/33] | Divisional application(s) | EP21183964.2 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - NOKIA ET AL, "Punctured Scheduling for Low Latency Transmissions", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160821), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-167308, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160821), XP051125827 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * | [X] - ZTE ET AL, "Multiplexing of eMBB and URLLC", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160821), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-166408 MULTIPLEXING OF EMBB AND URLLC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160821), XP051140214 [X] 1-6 * sections 2.2.1 and 2.3 * * figures 2, 8 * | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Consideration on multiplexing of non-sTTI and sTTI in the same carrier", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korea; 20160411 - 20160415, (20160402), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-162590, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_84b/Docs/, (20160402), XP051080278 [A] 1-6 * section 3 * | International search | [A]JP2009522846 (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL) [A] 1-6* , & US 2009/0013232 A1 & WO 2007/078219 A1 & CN 101385269 A *; | [XY] - ZTE, "Multiplexing of eMBB and URLLC", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#86 R1-166408, (20160821), XP051140214 [X] 1, 6 [Y] 2-5 | [Y] - NOKIA, ALCATEL -LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL et al., "On multiplexing of sTTI with TTI in DL", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#84b R1-163266, (20160400), XP051079934 [Y] 2-5 | by applicant | JP2016182134 |