EP3522718 - I DOMAIN CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTOR SPECIFIC TO ICAM-1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cornell University 395 Pine Tree Road, Suite 310 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Moonsoo Center for Technology Licensing ("CTL") 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca New York 14850 / US | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [2019/33] | Application number, filing date | 17851258.8 | 11.08.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017US46630 | Priority number, date | US201662383139P | 02.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662383139 P | US201662419817P | 09.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662419817 P | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018052594 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522718 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3522718 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/17, A61K38/17, A61K51/08, C07K14/725, C07K14/72, C12N5/0783, A61K39/00, A61P35/00 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
C07K14/723 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/1796 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/464411 (EP,KR,US);
A61K51/083 (EP,KR,US);
A61K51/088 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
C07K14/70521 (KR,US);
C07K14/70553 (KR,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/515 (US);
A61K2039/54 (KR,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/74 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2510/00 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | A61K35/17, A61K38/17, A61K51/08, C07K14/725, C07K14/72, C12N5/0783 | ||
Former IPC [2019/33] | A01N63/00, A61K48/00, C12N5/071, C07K1/00, C12N15/00, C07H21/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜR ICAM-1 SPEZIFISCHER CHIMÄRER ANTIGENREZEPTOR DER I DOMÄNE | [2019/33] | English: | I DOMAIN CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTOR SPECIFIC TO ICAM-1 | [2019/33] | French: | RÉCEPTEUR D'ANTIGÈNE CHIMÉRIQUE À DOMAINE I SPÉCIFIQUE D'ICAM-1 | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 31.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | MC | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | IE | 11.08.2023 | LU | 11.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
IE | 11.08.2023 | ||
LU | 11.08.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
LU | 11.08.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
LU | 11.08.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
LU | 11.08.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008311130 (JIN MOONSOO [US], et al); | [Y]US2014242701 (SHIKU HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2015139943 (CAMPANA DARIO [SG], et al); | by applicant | US2008311130 | US8021668 | US2014242701 |