EP3512686 - OVERLAY APPLICATOR TRAY AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belkin International, Inc. 12045 East Waterfront Drive Playa Vista, CA 90094-2536 / US | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACDONALD, Eric 11450 Church Street Unit 152 Rancho Cucamonga, California 91730 / US | 02 /
WADSWORTH, John 745 North Ontario Street Burbank, California 91505 / US | 03 /
SUCKLE, Mitchell 532 Roswell Avenue Long Beach, California 90814 / US | 04 /
KLEEMAN, David 619 1/2 Washington Boulevard Marina del Rey, California 90292 / US | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 17851653.0 | 15.09.2017 | [2019/30] | WO2017US51882 | Priority number, date | US201615266845 | 15.09.2016 Original published format: US201615266845 | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018053333 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3512686 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3512686 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C63/00, B32B7/12, B32B37/00, B32B37/02, B32B37/12, B29C63/02, G06F1/18, B29L31/34, B29C63/22, B29C63/16, B29C63/48, B32B3/02, B32B3/08, B32B3/26, B32B7/06, B32B27/08, B32B27/10, B32B27/36, B32B38/18, B32B39/00 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
B29C63/02 (EP);
B29C63/0004 (EP);
B29C63/0095 (EP);
B29C63/22 (EP);
B29C63/481 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/10 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B3/02 (EP);
B32B3/08 (EP);
B32B3/266 (EP);
B32B37/003 (EP);
B32B37/02 (EP);
B32B37/12 (EP);
B32B38/1841 (EP);
B32B39/00 (EP);
B32B41/00 (EP);
B32B7/06 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
G06F1/1626 (EP);
G06F1/1637 (EP);
B29C2063/0008 (EP);
B29C2063/027 (EP);
B29C63/0047 (EP);
B29C63/16 (EP);
B29L2031/3437 (EP);
B29L2031/3475 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2250/40 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2457/20 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/30] | B29C63/00, B32B7/12, B32B37/00, B32B37/02, B32B37/12, B29C63/02, G06F1/18, B29L31/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSAPPLIKATORSCHALE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/30] | English: | OVERLAY APPLICATOR TRAY AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | [2019/30] | French: | PLATEAU APPLICATEUR DE RECOUVREMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 12.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014124146 (PATEL SHRADDHA [US], et al); | [XI]DE102013021563 (KEMPKES DANIEL [DE]); | [X]US2016009024 (MASON ANDREW [US]) | International search | [A]WO03093879 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [A]US2007021068 (DEWHURST ALFRED [US]); | [Y]US2015047773 (WADSWORTH JOHN F [US], et al); | [A]US2015136314 (NAPIER KEIKO [US]); | [XY]US2016009024 (MASON ANDREW [US]) | Examination | US2012110868 | by applicant | US2014124146 | DE102013021563 | US2016009024 |