EP3518358 - SWITCHGEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Naoya c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | 02 /
KATOU, Takashi c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | 03 /
HONMA, Masahiro c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | 04 /
HORII, Chihiro c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | 05 /
KIYAMA, Kazuharu c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | 06 /
PANG, Jun Hoe c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | 07 /
MAKIYAMA, Fumio cc/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 17852611.7 | 09.05.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017JP17586 | Priority number, date | JP20160186719 | 26.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016186719 | [2019/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018055830 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3518358 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/025 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
H02B13/025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/31] | H02B1/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Title | German: | SCHALTANLAGE | [2019/31] | English: | SWITCHGEAR | [2019/31] | French: | APPAREILLAGE DE COMMUTATION | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2019 | Translation filed | 26.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 03.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN101291045 (SHANGHAI SIEMENS SWITCH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-10* page 5 - page 7; figure - *; | [Y]JP2011223721 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0043]; figures 1, 6 *; | [Y]JP2012196044 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-10 * figure - *; | [Y]CN203734167U (DALIAN DONGFANG ELECTRIC APPLIANCES MANUFACTURE CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * figure - *; | [Y]WO2015129716 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [XYI]KR101636343B (KWANGMYUNG ELECTRIC ENGINEERING CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042]; figure - * [Y] 11 [I] 7-10 | International search | [Y]JPS5880715U (Fuji Denki Seizo Kabushiki Kaisha) [Y] 1-11 * , specification, page 2, line 18 to page 4, line 3; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPS62145407U (Fuji Electric Co., Ltd.) [Y] 2-11 * , specification, page 2, lines 1 to 13; fig. 9 to 14 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH0233503U (Meidensha Corp.) [Y] 7-11 * , specification, page 5, line 9 to page 6, line 10; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011259600 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 11* , paragraphs [0014], [0022]; fig. 7 & CN 102280823 A *; | [Y]JP2012196044 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0027]; fig. 1 to 5 & US 2013/0327623 A1 paragraphs [0031] to [0037]; fig. 1 to 5 & WO 2012/124195 A1 & CN 103444026 A *; | [Y]WO2015129716 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0033]; fig. 1 to 4 & CN 106030943 A * | by applicant | JP2012196044 |