EP3498756 - NOVEL COMPOUND HAVING ISOCYANURIC SKELETON AND COMPOSITION IN WHICH SAID COMPOUND IS INCLUDED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, PL | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Tsuneo c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
NOSE, Masatoshi c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
MITSUHASHI, Hisashi c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 04 /
NII, Saya c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 05 /
SAKAMOTO, Eiji c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 06 /
OZAWA, Kaori c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2023/37] |
Former [2019/25] | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Tsuneo c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | ||
02 /
NOSE, Masatoshi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | |||
03 /
MITSUHASHI, Hisashi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | |||
04 /
NII, Saya c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | |||
05 /
SAKAMOTO, Eiji c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | |||
06 /
OZAWA, Kaori c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 17853181.0 | 22.09.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017JP34376 | Priority number, date | JP20160185759 | 23.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016185759 | JP20170083841 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017083841 | JP20170116961 | 14.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017116961 | JP20170149207 | 01.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017149207 | [2019/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018056413 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3498756 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3498756 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/333, C07D251/34, C07D405/06, C07F7/08, C07F7/18, C09K3/00, C08G59/28, C08G59/30, C08G65/336 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
C08G59/28 (EP);
C07D251/34 (EP,KR,US);
C08G65/33396 (CN);
C09D171/02 (US);
C03C17/32 (US);
C07D251/10 (US);
C07D405/06 (EP,KR);
C07D405/14 (US);
C07F7/08 (EP);
C07F7/18 (EP);
C07F7/1804 (KR,US);
C08G59/30 (EP);
C08G65/007 (EP);
C08G65/333 (KR);
C08G65/33317 (EP);
C08G65/336 (EP);
C09D5/00 (US);
C09D5/1637 (KR);
C09K3/00 (EP);
C23C14/12 (US);
C03C2217/76 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | C08G65/333, C07D251/34, C07D405/06, C07F7/08, C07F7/18, C09K3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE VERBINDUNG MIT ISOCYANURSÄUREGERÜST UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, IN DER DIESE VERBINDUNG ENTHALTEN IST | [2019/25] | English: | NOVEL COMPOUND HAVING ISOCYANURIC SKELETON AND COMPOSITION IN WHICH SAID COMPOUND IS INCLUDED | [2019/25] | French: | NOUVEAU COMPOSÉ AYANT UN SQUELETTE ISOCYANURIQUE ET COMPOSITION DANS LAQUELLE LEDIT COMPOSÉ EST INCLUS | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2019 | Translation filed | 14.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 15.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23189427.0 / EP4257631 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | LU | 22.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005047880 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-7,9 * page 13 *; | [XI]US2012156510 (OKAFUJI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9 * paragraphs [0045] , [0046]; claims 1,6 * [I] 2,6-8,10-12; | [X]US2012231297 (SUGIURA HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 26; example 1 *; | [XI]US2016002488 (TAKAO KIYOTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 18; example 3 * [I] 10-12; | [E]EP3395794 (UNIMATEC CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,3-5,9* page 10; example 1 * | International search | [XA]US3629255 (BEYLEVELD WILHELMUS M, et al) [X] 1-9 * , claims, examples 3, 5-6 & GB 1244144 A & DE 2009781 A1 & FR 2031293 A * [A] 10-12; | [XA]WO03002628 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * , claims, page 6, line 5 to page 6, line 16 & us 2004/0181008 A1, claims, paragraphs [0021]-[0051] & EP 1411073 A1 & TW 200508270 A * [A] 12; | [X]JP2005047880 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-12 * , claims, paragraphs [0067]-[0070] (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP2012184339 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-9 * , claims & US 2012/0231297 A1, claims * [A] 10-12; | [XA]JP2012207169 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0064], [0091] (Family: none) * [A] 10-12; | [XA]JP2014218444 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0038], [0134]-[0135] (Family: none) * [A] 10-12; | [XA]JP2014218548 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0141]-[0142] (Family: none) * [A] 10-12; | [PX]JP6182291B (UNIMATEC CO., LTD.) [PX] 1, 3-5, 9* , claims & WO 2017/110698 A1 * | by applicant | KR20140018556 |