EP3518633 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE HOUSING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMAGUCHI, Mitsushige c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-3193 / JP | 02 /
FUJIOKA, Takashi c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-3193 / JP | 03 /
HONMA, Masato c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-3193 / JP | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/24] |
Former [2019/31] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17853200.8 | 25.09.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017JP34455 | Priority number, date | JP20160186527 | 26.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016186527 | JP20160186528 | 26.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016186528 | [2019/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018056433 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3518633 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3518633 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/02, B32B5/02 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
B32B5/08 (EP);
H05K9/009 (KR);
H01Q1/40 (US);
B29C70/08 (KR);
B29C70/16 (KR);
B29C70/48 (KR);
B32B25/10 (EP);
B32B25/14 (EP);
B32B25/16 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/285 (EP);
B32B27/286 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B5/12 (EP);
B32B5/18 (EP);
B32B5/245 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
G06F1/1633 (EP,US);
H05K5/0217 (EP,US);
H05K5/0247 (US);
B29K2069/00 (KR);
B29K2081/00 (KR);
B29K2101/10 (KR);
B29K2307/04 (KR);
B29K2995/0003 (KR);
B32B2262/0246 (EP);
B32B2262/0253 (EP);
B32B2262/0261 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/04 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2262/103 (EP);
B32B2262/105 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2266/025 (EP);
B32B2307/306 (EP);
B32B2307/3065 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/31] | H05K5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/31] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE HOUSING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2019/31] | French: | BOÎTIER DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2019 | Translation filed | 15.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 29.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2940065 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [Y]WO2016002456 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [P]EP3163996 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | International search | [Y]WO2004060658 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [A]JP2006049878 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [XY]JP2008054306 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | Examination | US2009208721 | by applicant | JPH0946082 | JP2014148111 |