EP3515736 - VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE MOUNTED ON VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Junho IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Eunjin IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17853252.9 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017KR03580 | Priority number, date | KR20160120896 | 21.09.2016 Original published format: KR 20160120896 | US201715458825 | 14.03.2017 Original published format: US201715458825 | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018056538 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3515736 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3515736 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60J3/04, B60J1/02, B60R21/0134, B60R25/31, G06F3/041, G06F3/01 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
B60J3/04 (EP,KR,US);
B60J1/02 (KR);
B60J1/17 (US);
B60K35/00 (US);
B60K35/415 (EP,US);
B60K35/50 (EP,US);
B60K35/60 (EP,US);
B60R21/0134 (KR);
B60R25/31 (KR);
E05F15/75 (US);
G02B27/0101 (US);
G02F1/0121 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (KR);
G06F3/041 (KR);
B60K2360/27 (EP,US);
B60K2360/785 (EP,US);
B60K35/81 (US);
E06B2009/2464 (US);
G02B2027/014 (US);
G02F2201/58 (US);
G02F2203/01 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF EINEM FAHRZEUG MONTIERTE FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES FAHRZEUGS | [2019/31] | English: | VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE MOUNTED ON VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE VEHICLE | [2019/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE MONTÉ SUR VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DU VÉHICULE | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 03.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2007326526 (QUALITY KK) [X] 1,2,9,15 * figures 1, 5, 6 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0057] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0070] * [Y] 3-8,10-14; | [Y]JP2009143296 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [Y] 4-8,10,13 * paragraphs [0012] - [0026]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]JP2010006302 (AISIN AW CO) [Y] 3,6,10,14 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2010065721 (BROUDE CRAIG [US], et al) [Y] 11,12 * paragraphs [0014] , [ 0021]; figures 2,6 *; | [Y]KR20130071239 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 12* paragraphs [0028] , [ 0035]; figures 1, 3 *; | [Y]US2016247403 (KRAUSS DIETMAR [DE], et al) [Y] 5,7,8 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033] - [ 0043]; figure 2 * | International search | [XY]JP2007326526 (QUALITY KK) [X] 1-2, 11, 18-20 * See paragraphs [0047]-[0057], [0061], [0069]-[0070] and figures 1, 5-6. * [Y] 3-10, 12-17; | [Y]JP2009143296 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [Y] 4-10, 12, 16 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0026] and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]JP2010006302 (AISIN AW CO) [Y] 3, 7-8, 12, 17 * See paragraphs [0007]-[0011] and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US2010065721 (BROUDE CRAIG [US], et al) [Y] 13-15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0014], [0020] and figures 2, 6. *; | [Y]KR20130071239 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 15* See abstract, paragraphs [0028], [0035] and figures 1, 3. *; | [Y]US2016247403 (KRAUSS DIETMAR [DE], et al) [Y] 5, 9-10 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0033], [0043] and figure 2. * | by applicant | JP2007326526 |