EP3522410 - SOFT VALUE EXTRACTION METHOD AND DEVICE APPLICABLE TO OVXDM SYSTEM, AND OVXDM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHEN ZHEN KUANG-CHI HEZHONG TECHNOLOGY LTD. Suite 15D-02F No.1 Yangguang Huayi Building North of Guimiao Road West of Nanhai Road, Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2019/37] |
Former [2019/32] | For all designated states Shenzhen Super Data Link Technology Ltd. 101&201No.2 Workshop Xintianxiahuasai Industrial Plant Bantian Street Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Ruopeng Software Building No. 9 GaoxinZhong 1st Road High-Tech Industrial Estate Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
JI, Chunlin Software Building No. 9 GaoxinZhong 1st Road High-Tech Industrial Estate Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
ZHENG, Hao Software Building No. 9 GaoxinZhong 1st Road High-Tech Industrial Estate Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Shasha Software Building No. 9 GaoxinZhong 1st Road High-Tech Industrial Estate Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17854511.7 | 06.07.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017CN91963 | Priority number, date | CN201610865764 | 28.09.2016 Original published format: CN201610865764 | [2019/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018059057 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522410 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04J99/00, H04L25/03, H04L25/06, H04L25/497 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
H04L25/067 (EP);
H04L1/0045 (CN,KR);
H04J3/06 (US);
H04J99/00 (EP);
H04L1/00 (US);
H04L1/0047 (CN,KR);
H04L1/0048 (EP);
H04L1/0054 (EP,US);
H04L1/0059 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L25/03286 (EP);
H04L25/03318 (EP);
H04L25/49 (US);
H04L25/497 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EXTRAKTION VON WEICHEN WERTEN FÜR OVXDM-SYSTEM UND OVXDM-SYSTEM | [2019/32] | English: | SOFT VALUE EXTRACTION METHOD AND DEVICE APPLICABLE TO OVXDM SYSTEM, AND OVXDM SYSTEM | [2019/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'EXTRACTION DE VALEUR SOUPLE APPLICABLES À UN SYSTÈME OVXDM, ET SYSTÈME OVXDM | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2019 | Translation filed | 22.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 11.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/26] | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US6731700 (YAKHNICH EVGENY [IL], et al) [I] 1,2,4-9,11-15 * column 8, line 43 - column 13, line 40; figures 2, 3 * [A] 3,10; | [A] - JING WANG ET AL, "Single-Carrier Time-Domain Overlapping Multiplexing for Uplink Wireless Communications", SIGNAL DESIGN AND ITS APPLICATIONS IN COMMUNICATIONS, 2007. IWSDA 2007 . 3RD INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PI, (20070901), ISBN 978-1-4244-1073-6, pages 238 - 242, XP031194240 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - XILIN ZHANG ET AL, "An ISI Transmission and the Optimal Detection/Decoding of the Coded ISI System", SIGNAL DESIGN AND ITS APPLICATIONS IN COMMUNICATIONS, 2007. IWSDA 2007 . 3RD INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PI, (20070901), ISBN 978-1-4244-1073-6, pages 283 - 287, XP031194251 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN101404564 (UNIV NANJING AERONAUTICS [CN]) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]US2009092196 (OKUNEV YURI [US]) [A] 1-10* , entire document *; | [A]CN101431393 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP [CN]) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]CN101557364 (UNIV SHANDONG [CN]) [A] 1-10 * , description, page 3, paragraph 9 to page 4, paragraph 6 *; | [A]CN101895373 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire document * |