EP3502680 - HUMIDITY SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minebea Mitsumi Inc. 4106-73 Oaza Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun Nagano 389-0293 / JP | [2019/34] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 2-11-2 Tsurumaki Tama-Shi, Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANE, Taketomo c/o MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-11-2 Tsurumaki Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17856328.4 | 28.09.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017JP35198 | Priority number, date | JP20160195036 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016195036 | JP20170052768 | 17.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017052768 | [2019/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018062379 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502680 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/22 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
G01N27/223 (EP,US);
G01N27/225 (CN);
G01N27/048 (US);
G01N27/226 (CN);
G01N27/227 (CN,US);
G01N2027/222 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | FEUCHTIGKEITSSENSOR | [2019/26] | English: | HUMIDITY SENSOR | [2019/26] | French: | CAPTEUR D'HUMIDITÉ | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2019 | Translation filed | 21.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 18.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5075816 (STORMBOM LARS [FI]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 11; figures 2, 3 * [I] 2-11; | [Y]JPH04155253 (ASAGA AKIO) [Y] 2-6 * paragraph [0001]; figures 2, 3 *; | [Y]EP1387164 (YAMATAKE CORP [JP]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0066] - [0072]; figure 9 *; | [Y]US2006186901 (ITAKURA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 13 * figures 5-7 *; | [XYI]US2013207673 (TONDOKORO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,9,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0054]; figures 1A, 2A, 4B * [Y] 2-7,12-14 [I] 2-4,7,8,10,11; | [Y]US2015185176 (KOO TAE KON [KR], et al) [Y] 12,14* figures 3, 5, 6 * | International search | [Y]JPH04155253 (ASAGA AKIO) [Y] 2-4, 6-8, 10-11 * , page 3, lower right column, line 16 to page 4, lower left column, line 2, fig. 2-4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH10221288 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-14* , (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2011065507 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2-4, 6-8, 10-12, 14 * , paragraphs [0007]-[0008], [0017] & CN 102549416 A *; | [XY]WO2012046501 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1, 5, 9, 13 * , paragraphs [0007], [0020] -[0049], fig. 1-2 &US2013/0207673A1, paragraphs [0009], [0026]-[0054], fig. 1-2 & CN 103154715 A * [Y] 2-4, 6-8, 10-12, 14; | [Y]US2015185176 (KOO TAE KON [KR], et al) [Y] 2-4, 6-8, 10-12, 14 * , paragraph [0084], fig. 3-6 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS5547296B | JP2013133264 | JP2016195036 | JP2017052768 |