EP3520724 - MEDICAL DEVICE AND TREATMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTSUBO, Seiichi c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 1500 Inokuchi Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17856336.7 | 28.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017JP35214 | Priority number, date | JP20160193183 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016193183 | [2019/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018062387 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3520724 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61M25/00, A61B18/12, A61B18/14 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
A61B18/1487 (EP,US);
A61B17/3476 (EP,US);
A61B17/34 (EP,US);
A61B17/3417 (EP);
A61B17/3421 (EP);
A61B17/3462 (US);
A61B18/1492 (EP);
A61M25/00 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61B18/1206 (EP);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2905 (US);
A61B2017/3433 (EP);
A61B2017/3454 (EP);
A61B2018/00166 (EP);
A61B2018/00196 (EP);
A61B2018/00351 (EP);
A61B2018/0038 (EP);
A61B2018/00577 (EP);
A61B2018/00827 (US);
A61B2018/1253 (EP);
A61B2018/142 (EP);
A61B2018/1497 (EP);
A61B2018/167 (EP);
A61L29/041 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | A61B17/34, A61M25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/32] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE AND TREATMENT METHOD | [2019/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL ET MÉTHODE THÉRAPEUTIQUE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2019 | Translation filed | 29.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 30.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.03.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/30] | 18.03.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5221281 (KLICEK MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 2,3,4,5,6,7 * [I] 7; | [A]US6302898 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [A] 7* figure 6 *; | [X]US6770070 (BALBIERZ DANIEL J [US]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * figure 9 * * column 9, line 44 - line 45 * * column 14, line 47 - line 53 *; | [X]EP1146816 (NUVASIVE INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0013] * * figures 12,13,14,15,17 *; | [A]EP2077807 (BIOMEDCRAFT DESIGNS INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPH06142111 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-8 * , fig. 8, 12 & US 5423848 A, fig. 58a, 58b & DE 4312147 A1 *; | [XA]JP2554849B (VALLEYLAB, INC.) [X] 1-3, 8 * , column 11, line 4 to column 12, line 41, fig. 3-5 & US 5221281 A, column 6, line 66 to column 8, line 37, fig. 3-5 & WO 1994/000060 A1 & JP 7-504594 A * [A] 4-7; | [A]JP2012050538 (TERUMO CORP) [A] 1-8* , fig. 1-6 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2000201946 | JP2016193183 |