EP3521272 - STILBENE DERIVATIVE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ozchela Inc. 123, Hwarang-ro, Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02752 / KR | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Min-Kyung 101-201 26 Wolgok-ro 14-gil Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02794 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jin-Kak 112-502 1337-23 Hyohaeng-ro Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18383 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Won-Seok 106-1511 877 Gwangmyeong-ro Gwangmyeong-si Gyeonggi-do 14287 / KR | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17856839.0 | 29.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017KR10998 | Priority number, date | KR20160127050 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: KR 20160127050 | KR20170102983 | 14.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170102983 | [2019/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018062953 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3521272 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/42, C07C255/41, C07C255/35, C07C253/30, C07D241/04, A61K31/496, C07C255/37 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
C07C229/38 (EP);
C07C255/42 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07C63/331 (US);
A61K31/235 (US);
A61K31/277 (US);
A61K31/4453 (US);
A61K31/495 (US);
A61K31/496 (IL,KR);
A61K31/5375 (US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C15/52 (US);
C07C229/56 (EP);
C07C229/68 (US);
C07C253/30 (IL,KR,US);
C07C255/35 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07C255/37 (EP,IL,US);
C07C255/41 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07C51/353 (EP);
C07C63/66 (EP);
C07C65/19 (EP);
C07C67/343 (EP);
C07C69/76 (EP);
C07D207/08 (EP,US);
C07D213/79 (EP,US);
C07D213/80 (EP,IL,US);
C07D221/00 (EP,US);
C07D241/04 (IL,KR,US);
C07D265/30 (EP,US);
C07D295/155 (EP,US);
C07D295/192 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,IL);
C07C2601/08 (EP,IL);
C07C2601/14 (EP,IL)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/353, C07C63/66 (EP);
C07C51/353, C07C65/19 (EP);
C07C67/343, C07C69/76 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | C07C255/42, C07C255/41, C07C255/35, C07C253/30, C07D241/04, A61K31/496 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | STILBENDERIVAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/32] | English: | STILBENE DERIVATIVE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [2019/32] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE STILBÈNE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2019 | Translation filed | 29.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 11.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012251581 (GREGORY MATTHEW ALAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X] - R. MERCKX, "Sur quelques produits de condensation de systèmes à méthylène actif avec les aldéhydes", BULLETIN DES SOCIÉTÉS CHIMIQUES BELGES : VLAAMSE CHEMISCHE VERENIGING, BE, (19490101), vol. 58, no. 10-12, doi:10.1002/bscb.19490581005, ISSN 0037-9646, pages 460 - 471, XP055684698 [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * compounds iv, v, xi, X * * page 469 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bscb.19490581005 | [X] - KURT RORIG, "Condensations of Substituted Benzaldehydes with m- or p-Acetylphenylacetonitrile 1", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19531101), vol. 75, no. 21, doi:10.1021/ja01117a070, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5381 - 5383, XP055684658 [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * page 5381; compound I * * table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01117a070 | [X] - MEHTAB PARVEEN ET AL, "Stereoselective synthesis of Z-acrylonitrile derivatives: catalytic and acetylcholinesterase inhibition studies", NEW JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, GB, (20140101), vol. 38, no. 4, doi:10.1039/c3nj01384g, ISSN 1144-0546, page 1655, XP055684689 [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * Scheme 2;; compounds 2b, 2c, 2h, 2i * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3nj01384g | [X] - YOUN SO WON ET AL, "Bi(OTf)3-mediated intramolecular hydroamination of 2-aminostilbenes for the synthesis of 2-arylindolines", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160626), vol. 72, no. 32, doi:10.1016/J.TET.2016.06.063, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 4902 - 4909, XP029637911 [X] 1-4,6,7,11 * page 4909 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2016.06.063 | International search | [XA]US2014336136 (BITZER JENS [DE], et al) [X] 1-16 * See claims 4-6. * [A] 17, 18; | [X]US2009325930 (HAMAOKA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0041], [1046]. *; | [X]US2006205792 (WONG NORMAN C [CA], et al) [X] 1-16, 18 * See claims 6, 9; paragraphs [1023], [1090], [1105]; formula 2. *; | [X] - MARTINEZ, V. et al., "Benzo[f]azino[2,1-alphathalazinium Cations: Novel DNA Intercalating Chromophores with Antiproliferative Activity", Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (20040000), vol. 47, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1021/jm0310434, pages 1136 - 1148, XP055497126 [X] 1-16 * See formula 3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0310434 | [X] - AZMI, M. N. et al., "Design, Synthesis and Cytotoxic Evaluation of o-Carboxamido Stilbene Analogues", International Journal of Molecular Sciences, (20130000), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.3390/ijms141223369, pages 23369 - 23389, XP055497134 [X] 1-16 * See abstract; formula 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms141223369 | [X] - ALAM, M. S. et al., "Synthesis and Evaluation of (Z)-2,3-diphenylaerylonitrile Analogs as Anti-cancer and Anti-microbial Agents", European Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (20130000), vol. 69, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ejmech.2013.08.031, pages 790 - 797, XP028762807 [X] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmech.2013.08.031 |