EP3519668 - IMPROVED VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osborne, Lawrence 2210 Soledad Canyon Road, Suite H Acton, CA 93510 / US | For all designated states Prather, Joshua, Terry 2210 Soledad Canyon Road Suite H Acton, CA 93510 / US | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17857241.8 | 22.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017US53060 | Priority number, date | US201662403041P | 30.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662403041 P | US201715703791 | 13.09.2017 Original published format: US201715703791 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018063942 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3519668 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/08, E21B34/14, F16K11/10, F16K27/04, F16K31/122 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
F16K27/041 (EP,US);
E21B34/08 (EP,US);
E21B43/126 (EP,US);
F16K11/0716 (US);
F16K11/105 (EP,US);
F16K31/1221 (EP,US);
E21B2200/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | E21B34/06, F16K17/04, E21B43/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE VENTILANORDNUNG | [2019/32] | English: | IMPROVED VALVE ASSEMBLY | [2019/32] | French: | ENSEMBLE CLAPET AMÉLIORÉ | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 20.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/35] | 25.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4244607 (BLOSE THOMAS L) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, line 10 - line 24 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 48; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2011259428 (OSBORNE LAWRENCE [US]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0024] - [0055]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN102383770 (UNIV SOUTHWEST PETROLEUM) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [Y]US2015184487 (OSBORNE LAWRENCE [US]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0030] - [0037] - [0 43] , [0 44]; figures 4A, 4B * | International search | [A]US6125930 (MOYES PETER BARNES [GB]) [A] 1-2* See column 5, line 14 - column 8, line 8; and figures 1-9. *; | [A]US6289990 (DILLON DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1-2 * See column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 48 and figures 1A-1B, 2-4. *; | [A]EP1260671 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [A] 1-2 * See paragraphs [00l3] [0029] and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US2010282476 (TESSIER LYNN P [CA], et al) [A] 1-2 * See paragraphs [0057]-[0071] and figures 10A-10F. *; | [A]US2015184487 (OSBORNE LAWRENCE [US]) [A] 1-2 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0060], claim 1 and figures 4A-4E. * |