EP3518944 - ADAPTIVE CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTOR T-CELL DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baylor College of Medicine One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030-3411 / US | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Norihiro 7550 Kirby Drive 1542 Houston, TX 77030 / US | 02 /
BRENNER, Malcolm, K. 4802 Willow Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | 03 /
VERA, Juan Fernando, Valdes 2727 Drexel Drive Houston, TX 77027 / US | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17857584.1 | 29.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017US54604 | Priority number, date | US201662402618P | 30.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662402618 P | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018064626 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3518944 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/17, A61K39/00, C07K16/28 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
C07K16/3069 (US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,US);
A61K2239/54 (EP,US);
A61K2239/58 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,US);
A61K39/464493 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
C07K14/70521 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
G01N33/5047 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/524 (EP,US);
C07K2317/526 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVER CHIMÄRER ANTIGENREZEPTOR-T-ZELLENENTWURF | [2019/32] | English: | ADAPTIVE CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTOR T-CELL DESIGN | [2019/32] | French: | CONCEPTION DE LYMPHOCYTES T DU RÉCEPTEUR D'ANTIGÈNE CHIMERIQUE ADAPTATIF | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015132604 (UCL BUSINESS PLC [GB]); | [XY]WO2016014789 (BLUEBIRD BIO INC [US]); | [Y]WO2016061574 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]); | [Y]WO2016090369 (HOPE CITY [US], et al); | International search | [A]WO2015105522 (FORMAN STEPHEN J [US], et al); |