EP3518897 - OPHTHALMIC DRUG SUSTAINED RELEASE FORMULATION AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mati Therapeutics Inc. 4317 Dunning Lane Austin, TX 78746 / US | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UTKHEDE, Deepank 201-4475 Wayburne Drive Burnaby, British Columbia V5G 4X4 / CA | 02 /
JONES, Catherine 201-4475 Wayburne Drive Burnaby, British Columbia V5G 4X4 / CA | 03 /
WISEMAN, David 201-4475 Wayburne Drive Burnaby, British Columbia V5G 4X4 / CA | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/06] |
Former [2019/32] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 17857601.3 | 30.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017US54654 | Priority number, date | US201662402938P | 30.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662402938 P | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018064648 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3518897 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3518897 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K47/34, A61K47/10, A61K31/165, A61K38/13, A61F9/00, A61L27/54 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
A61K9/0048 (EP);
A61K9/0051 (EP,KR,US);
A61F9/0017 (EP,KR,US);
A61F9/00772 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/136 (KR);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP);
A61K31/405 (EP);
A61K31/569 (US);
A61K31/573 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/60 (KR);
A61K38/13 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/26 (EP);
A61K47/34 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0092 (EP);
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
A61P27/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUGENMEDIKATION MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/32] | English: | OPHTHALMIC DRUG SUSTAINED RELEASE FORMULATION AND USES THEREOF | [2019/32] | French: | FORMULATION OPHTALMIQUE À LIBÉRATION PHARMACOLOGIQUE PROLONGÉE ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22152097.6 / EP4046609 | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/03] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2017 | AL | 09.02.2022 | CY | 09.02.2022 | CZ | 09.02.2022 | EE | 09.02.2022 | FI | 09.02.2022 | HR | 09.02.2022 | LT | 09.02.2022 | LV | 09.02.2022 | MC | 09.02.2022 | MK | 09.02.2022 | PL | 09.02.2022 | RO | 09.02.2022 | RS | 09.02.2022 | SI | 09.02.2022 | SK | 09.02.2022 | SM | 09.02.2022 | BG | 09.05.2022 | NO | 09.05.2022 | GR | 10.05.2022 | IS | 09.06.2022 | PT | 09.06.2022 | IE | 30.09.2022 | LU | 30.09.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 30.09.2017 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.09.2017 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 09.02.2022 | |
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 09.02.2022 | |
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | FI | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
NO | 09.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008107694 (TROGDEN JOHN T [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0012]; figure 1; example 4 *; | [Y]US2009196905 (SPADA LON T [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0103] *; | [X]US2015133546 (BUTUNER ZUHAL [CA], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0080] , [0109] , [0124] , [0191] , [0266] , [0287]; figure - *; | [Y] - NG XU WEN ET AL, "A biodegradable ocular implant for long-term suppression of intraocular pressure", DRUG DELIVERY AND TRANSLATIONAL RESEARCH, SPRINGER, GERMANY, vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S13346-015-0240-4, ISSN 2190-393X, (20150623), pages 469 - 479, (20150623), XP035530672 [Y] 1-19 * figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13346-015-0240-4 | International search | [Y]EP0179583 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [Y] 92-103 * The entire document, and more specifically: pg 5, In 20-21 and In 29-32; pg 6, In 20-30; pg 8, In 22-29; pg 9, In 28-35; pg 10, In 1-13; pg 11, In 12-23; pg 13, In 21-34; claims 2-3; abstract *; | [Y]US5632773 (GRAHAM RICHARD S [US], et al) [Y] 90-91 * col 1, In 43-48; col 3, In 29-43 *; | [Y]WO9951201 (SUNSCAPE DEVELOPMENTS LIMITED [NZ], et al) [Y] 37, 41-42, 59-60 and 65- 91 * The entire document, and more specifically: pg 2, In 16-18; pg 3, In 28-31; pg 4, In 1-3 and In 22 -32; abstract *; | [Y]US2007280992 (MARGARON PHILIPPE M C [CA], et al) [Y] 1-64 * The entire document, and more specifically: para [0006]-[0007], [0009]-[0010], [0017], [0019], [0022], [0073], [0084], [0117], [0119]-[0120], [0156], [0208]; abstract *; | [Y]US2009196905 (SPADA LON T [US], et al) [Y] 58-64 * para [0035], [0046], [0053], [0072], [0103] *; | [Y]US2011054031 (MCNAMARA TIM [US], et al) [Y] 20-21, 56-57 and 81 * para [0010], [0055], [0077], [0097], [0110], [0116], [0123], [0134] *; | [Y]US2015105468 (MARTINEZ-ALZAMORA FERNANDO [ES], et al) [Y] 102* para [0002], [0004], [0109]-[0110], [0115]-[0116] *; | [Y]US2015133546 (BUTUNER ZUHAL [CA], et al) [Y] 1-55, 62-63 and 65-103 * para [0002], [0006], [0009]-[0010], [0012], [0023], [0032], [0040], [0042], [0074], [0077], [0079]-[0080], [0083]-[0084], [0087], [0090], [0101], [0109], [0126], [0131], [0135], [0137], [0160], [0162], [0164], [0168]-[0169], [0196], [0229], [0251], [0264], [0266], [0274]; claim 124; figures 2A -2B * |