EP3522935 - BACTERIAL MINICELLS FOR DELIVERING NUCLEIC ACID ADJUVANTS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EnGeneIC Molecular Delivery Pty Ltd. Building 2, 25 Sirius Road Lane Cove West Sydney NSW 2066 / AU | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAHMBHATT, Himanshu c/o Engeneic Molecular Delivery PTY LTD Building 2 25 Sirius Road Lane Cove West Sydney New South Wales 2066 / AU | 02 /
MACDIARMID, Jennifer c/o Engeneic Molecular Delivery PTY LTD Building 2 25 Sirius Road Lane Cove West Sydney New South Wales 2066 / AU | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 17857944.7 | 04.10.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017IB56131 | Priority number, date | US201662405074P | 06.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662405074 P | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018065923 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522935 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, A61K47/46, A61K39/39, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, C07K16/12, C07K16/28, C12N15/10, C40B40/02 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,IL,US);
C12N15/63 (IL,US);
A61K35/74 (IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,US);
C07K14/195 (IL,US);
C07K16/00 (IL,US);
C07K16/1235 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/28 (IL,US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,IL,US);
C12N15/1034 (EP,IL,US);
C12N15/117 (IL,US);
C40B40/02 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/543 (IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/52 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/33] | A61K48/00, A61K47/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Extension states | BA | 29.04.2019 | ME | 29.04.2019 | Validation states | MA | 29.04.2019 | MD | 29.04.2019 | Title | German: | BAKTERIELLE MINIZELLEN ZUR FREISETZUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREADJUVANZIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/33] | English: | BACTERIAL MINICELLS FOR DELIVERING NUCLEIC ACID ADJUVANTS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | [2019/33] | French: | MINICELLULES BACTÉRIENNES POUR L'ADMINISTRATION D'ADJUVANTS D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 15.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012207754 (GIACALONE MATTHEW J [US], et al); | [Y]EP2599866 (UNIV HOKKAIDO NAT UNIV CORP [JP]); | International search | [Y]US2007298056 (BRAHMBHATT HIMANSHU [AU], et al); | [Y]US2012142079 (SABBADINI ROGER A [US], et al); | [Y]US2015098897 (BRAHMBHATT HIMANSHU [AU], et al); |