EP3524269 - ANTICANCER COMPOSITION TO BE ADMINISTERED INTO A LYMPH NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/33] | DRUG EFFECTIVE FOR LYMPHOGENOUS DRUG ADMINISTRATING METHOD | ||
[2023/25] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tohoku University 2-1-1, Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2024/05] |
Former [2021/47] | For all designated states Tohoku University 2-1-1, Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-10-30, Kaigan Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | |||
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states Tohoku University 2-1-1, Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19 Higashi-Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODAMA, Tetsuya c/o Tohoku University 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Shiro c/o Tohoku University 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 03 /
NOHARA, Go c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-10-30, Kaigan Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | [2021/47] |
Former [2019/33] | 01 /
KODAMA, Tetsuya c/o Tohoku University 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | ||
02 /
MORI, Shiro c/o Tohoku University 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | |||
03 /
NOHARA, Go c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19 Higashi-Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/08] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/33] | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17858117.9 | 31.08.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017JP31483 | Priority number, date | JP20160197614 | 05.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016197614 | [2019/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018066278 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3524269 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3524269 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4745, A61K31/513, A61P35/00, A61K31/337, A61K9/00 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/337 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/437 (KR);
A61K31/4745 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K45/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,RU,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | A61K45/00, A61K31/4745, A61K31/513, A61P35/00, A61K31/337 | ||
Former IPC [2019/33] | A61K45/00, A61K31/4745, A61K31/513, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTI-KREBS-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERABREICHUNG IN EINEN LYMPHKNOTEN | [2023/25] | English: | ANTICANCER COMPOSITION TO BE ADMINISTERED INTO A LYMPH NODE | [2023/25] | French: | COMPOSITION ANTICANCÉREUSE À ADMINISTRER DANS UN GANGLION LYMPHATIQUE | [2023/25] |
Former [2019/33] | VERABREICHUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR LYMPHOGENES ARZNEIMITTEL | ||
Former [2019/33] | DRUG EFFECTIVE FOR LYMPHOGENOUS DRUG ADMINISTRATING METHOD | ||
Former [2019/33] | MÉDICAMENT EFFICACE POUR UN PROCÉDÉ D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT LYMPHOGÈNE | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2019 | Translation filed | 29.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 01.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 07.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 07.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.12.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CN101045163B (CHONGQING LUMMY PHARMACEUTICAL) [X] 1,2,4,8-10 * paragraphs [0061] , [0078] * [A] 3 [I] 5-7; | [IA] - SHIGEKI KATO ET AL, "A Novel Treatment Method for Lymph Node Metastasis Using a Lymphatic Drug Delivery System with Nano/Microbubbles and Ultrasound", JOURNAL OF CANCER, AU, (2015), vol. 6, no. 12, doi:10.7150/jca.13028, ISSN 1837-9664, pages 1282 - 1294, XP055689690 [I] 1,4-10 * abstract * * page 1288, column 2, first full paragraph * * page 1290, column 1 * * figures 2, 4 * [A] 3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7150/jca.13028 | [A] - V.R.N. TELIS ET AL, "Viscosity of Aqueous Carbohydrate Solutions at Different Temperatures and Concentrations", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD PROPERTIES, US, (20070117), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1080/10942910600673636, ISSN 1094-2912, pages 185 - 195, XP055690027 [A] 6,7 * page 190; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10942910600673636 | International search | [YA]JP2011518217 (Fidia Farmaceutici S.p.A.) [Y] 1, 2, 4-10 * , claims 11, 13; paragraphs [0017], [0018] & WO 2009/130564 A1 claims 11, 12, 21; page 17, lines 7 to 18 & US 2011/0189265 A1 *[A] 3; | [XYA] - CARR J. et al., "Lymphatic metastasis; lymphangiochemotherapy of mammary cancer: ascitic form of rat mammary adenocarcinoma 13762", Clinical and Experimental Metastasis, (19830000), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1007/BF00118470, pages 29 - 38, XP009514657 [X] 1, 2, 4-10 * particularly, Abstract, page 30, lines 15 to 49, page 34, lines 7 to 16, page 37, lines 29 to 39, Figure 5, 6 * [Y] 1, 2, 4-10 [A] 3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00118470 | [Y] - "Hikari Glucose Injection 5%, 10%, 20%, 30%, 50%", Iyakuhin Interview Form, (20150000), vol. 5, pages 1 - 26, XP009518630 [Y] 6, 7 * , particularly, page 4, lines 10 to 21 * | by applicant | - SHIGEKI KATO; SHIRO MORI; TETSUYA KODAMA, Journal of Cancer, (20150000), vol. 6, no. 12, pages 1282 - 1294 | - J Immunol Methods, (20130000), vol. 389, no. 1-2, pages 69 - 78 | - PLoS One, (20130000), vol. 8, no. 2, page e55797 | - J Immunol Methods, (20130329), vol. 389, no. 1-2, pages 69 - 78 |