EP3522881 - HIGH MOBILITY GROUP B1 PROTEIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Afecta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2102 Business Center Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOVACS, Bruce 2102 Business Center Drive Irvine California 92612 / US | 02 /
SHAHBAHRAMI, Kamron 17 Foxhill Irvine California 92604 / US | 03 /
NICOLA, George 8288 Gilman Dr. Unit 43 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2019/34] |
Former [2019/33] | 01 /
KOVACS, Bruce 2102 Business Center Drive Irvine California 92612 / US | ||
02 /
SHAHBAHRAMI, Kamron 17 Foxhill Irvine California 92604 / US | |||
03 /
NICOLA, George 2102 Business Center Drive Irvine California 92612 / US | Representative(s) | Elsy, David Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Elsy, David Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17859072.5 | 04.10.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017US55041 | Priority number, date | US201662404508P | 05.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662404508 P | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018067638 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3522881 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C235/10, C07D295/13, A61K31/195, A61K31/165, A61K45/06, A61P29/00 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/165 (EP);
C07C233/08 (US);
A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
C07C229/38 (US);
C07C235/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/33] | A61K31/195, A61K31/165 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Title | German: | HOCHMOBILE GRUPPE-B1-PROTEIN-INHIBITOREN | [2019/33] | English: | HIGH MOBILITY GROUP B1 PROTEIN INHIBITORS | [2019/33] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE PROTÉINE DU GROUPE B1 À MOBILITÉ ÉLEVÉE | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 10.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/18] | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004053841 (TRACEY KEVIN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 4a * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0067] - [0088] *; | [Y]US2008317809 (FUMERO SILVANO [IT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] ** claims *; | [XY] - MARÍA GÁLVEZ-LLOMPART ET AL, "Selection of nutraceutical compounds as COX inhibitors by molecular topology", MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY RESEARCH., US, (20121123), vol. 22, no. 7, doi:10.1007/s00044-012-0361-y, ISSN 1054-2523, pages 3466 - 3477, XP055116300 [X] 1,2,4-7,9 * abstract * * page 3469, table 1: "Mefexamide" * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00044-012-0361-y | International search | [Y]US2004053841 (TRACEY KEVIN J [US], et al) [Y] 4-6* ; figure 4A; paragraphs [0008], [0087]-[0088] *; | [Y]US2006205980 (HANAZAWA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * ; paragraph [0006] *; | [Y]US2008045513 (DASSE OLIVIER [US]) [Y] 1-8 * ; paragraphs [0005], [0009], [0055]-[0056], [0058]-[0059], [0069], [0079], [0130], [0144] *; | [X] - Anonymous, "N-(Aminomethyl)-2-phenoxyacetamide", PUBCHEM Compound, (20071205), Database accession no. CID 23103273, URL: NCBI, XP055611477 [X] 1 * >; page 3, formula * |