EP3525785 - KDM5 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [2022/42] |
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANSOOR, Umar Faruk 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 02 /
FISCHER, Christian 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 03 /
SILIPHAIVANH, Phieng 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 04 /
TORRES, Luis 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 05 /
GUNAYDIN, Hakan 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 06 /
SLOMAN, David, L. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Povey, Alexander W.G. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. European Patents Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17859538.5 | 06.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017US55464 | Priority number, date | US201662407224P | 12.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662407224 P | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018071283 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525785 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D519/00, A61P35/00, A61K31/519, A61K31/5377, A61K31/538, A61K31/541 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D519/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | A61K31/4353, C07D471/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | KDM5-INHIBITOREN | [2019/34] | English: | KDM5 INHIBITORS | [2019/34] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE KDM5 | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.04.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 21.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS57175193 (SANKYO CO); | [XA]WO2004041825 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [XA]WO2008037607 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [A]WO2014055634 (UNIV YALE [US]); | [A]WO2014139326 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2015035062 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2015135094 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2007112006 (SCHIEMANN KAI [DE], et al); | [X]WO2011114148 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2011134867 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | [A]US2013317021 (WOLKERSTORFER ANDREA [AT], et al); | [A]WO2014144850 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2004126699 | US2789118 | US2990401 | US3048581 | US3126375 | US3749712 | US3928326 | US3929768 | US3996359 | US4231938 | US4294926 | US4319039 | US4346227 | US4410629 | US4444784 | US4537859 | US4681893 | US4782084 | US4820850 | US4885314 | US4911165 | EP0360390 | US4916239 | US4929437 | WO9005525 | WO9005729 | EP0394989 | EP0428434 | EP0429366 | EP0430771 | US5030447 | EP0436334 | WO9109844 | EP0443132 | WO9118899 | WO9201688 | WO9206079 | EP0482539 | US5118853 | WO9212151 | US5134142 | EP0498069 | EP0499313 | WO9215585 | WO9217449 | US5162339 | EP0512901 | EP0512902 | EP0514273 | EP0514274 | EP0514275 | EP0514276 | WO9220661 | WO9220676 | EP0515681 | EP0517589 | WO9221677 | WO9222569 | EP0520555 | US5177080 | WO9300330 | WO9300331 | EP0522808 | US5180589 | WO9301159 | WO9301165 | WO9301169 | WO9301170 | US5189164 | EP0528495 | EP0532456 | EP0533280 | WO9306099 | EP0536817 | WO9309116 | WO9310073 | EP0545478 | WO9314084 | WO9314113 | US5232929 | EP0558156 | US5242930 | WO9318023 | WO9319064 | WO9321155 | WO9321181 | GB2266529 | WO9323380 | WO9324465 | US5273995 | EP0577394 | WO9400440 | WO9401402 | GB2268931 | GB2269170 | WO9402461 | WO9402595 | GB2269590 | WO9403429 | WO9403445 | US5290946 | WO9404494 | WO9404496 | EP0585913 | WO9405625 | EP0590152 | WO9407843 | GB2271774 | WO9408997 | WO9410165 | WO9410167 | WO9410168 | WO9410170 | WO9411368 | EP0599538 | WO9413639 | WO9413663 | EP0604181 | WO9414767 | WO9415932 | WO9415903 | EP0610793 | US5342952 | WO9419357 | WO9419320 | WO9419323 | US5344991 | WO9420500 | EP0618221 | US5354772 | US5356896 | WO9426735 | WO9426740 | US5373003 | WO9429309 | US5380738 | EP0634402 | WO9502595 | US5387595 | WO9504040 | WO9504042 | US5393790 | WO9506645 | WO9507886 | WO9507908 | WO9508542 | WO9508549 | WO9510514 | WO9510515 | WO9510516 | US5409944 | WO9511917 | WO9511880 | WO9512612 | WO9512572 | WO9514017 | US5420245 | WO9515311 | WO9516679 | WO9517382 | WO9518124 | WO9518129 | WO9519344 | US5436265 | WO9520575 | WO9521819 | WO9522525 | WO9523798 | WO9524612 | WO9525086 | EP0675112 | WO9526338 | US5459270 | WO9528418 | US5466823 | WO9530674 | WO9530687 | WO9532987 | US5474995 | EP0686629 | WO9533744 | WO9534535 | WO9600736 | EP0693489 | EP0694535 | US5489691 | EP0696593 | GB2292144 | WO9605529 | WO9605168 | WO9605169 | WO9605181 | WO9605193 | WO9605203 | US5494926 | WO9606138 | WO9606193 | WO9606094 | US5496833 | EP0699655 | EP0699674 | WO9607649 | GB2293168 | GB2293169 | WO9610562 | EP0707006 | US5510510 | EP0708101 | EP0709375 | EP0709376 | WO9616443 | US5523430 | EP0714891 | WO9616939 | WO9617861 | WO9618643 | US5532359 | WO9620197 | US5536752 | WO9621701 | WO9621456 | WO9621661 | WO9622278 | EP0723959 | WO9624611 | WO9624612 | US5550142 | EP0733632 | WO9629304 | WO9629317 | WO9629326 | WO9629328 | WO9630343 | WO9630017 | WO9630018 | WO9630362 | WO9630363 | WO9631111 | WO9631477 | WO9631478 | WO9631501 | WO9631214 | WO9632385 | WO9633159 | US5571792 | WO9634850 | WO9634851 | WO9637489 | US5589485 | WO9700252 | WO9701553 | WO9701554 | GB2302689 | WO9703047 | WO9703050 | WO9702920 | WO9703066 | US5602098 | WO9704785 | US5604260 | WO9708144 | WO9714671 | WO9717070 | WO9717362 | WO9718206 | US5633272 | WO9718813 | WO9719084 | EP0776893 | WO9719942 | US5637699 | WO9721701 | WO9721702 | WO9723478 | WO9726246 | WO9730053 | US5661152 | WO9738665 | WO9744350 | US5698584 | US5710140 | WO9802436 | US5719147 | WO9828980 | WO9829119 | US5861419 | US5932598 | US6001843 | US6020343 | US6069134 | WO0044777 | WO0050032 | WO0061186 | US6284781 | US6288237 | WO0170677 | WO0190084 | WO0230912 | WO0236555 | WO0247671 | WO02081435 | WO02081433 | WO02083064 | WO02083139 | WO02083140 | WO02083138 | WO03013506 | WO03018543 | WO03039460 | WO03050064 | WO03050122 | WO03049527 | WO03049679 | WO03049678 | WO03079973 | WO03084473 | WO03086404 | WO03086279 | WO03086394 | WO03086403 | WO03093252 | WO03093264 | WO03093251 | WO03093253 | WO03099211 | WO03105855 | WO03106417 | WO2004031137 | WO2004031139 | WO2004031138 | WO2004037171 | WO2004039774 | WO2004039800 | WO2004039370 | WO2004041162 | US2004102360 | US2004116432 | WO2004058148 | WO2004058700 | WO2004089911 | WO2004096131 | WO2004096129 | WO2004096135 | WO2004096130 | WO2004101538 | WO2004101539 | US2005029941 | WO2005014553 | WO2005017190 | US2005044294 | US2005043361 | WO2005018638 | WO2005019206 | WO2005019205 | WO2005018547 | WO2005030731 | US2005176776 | WO2005100356 | WO2005100344 | WO2014055634 | WO2014139326 | WO2015035062 | WO2015135094 | US19880607341 | US19370606527 | US19690606704 | US19560097828 | US20080602357 | US19970602446 | US20070957251 |