EP3526888 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR HIGH EFFICIENCY POWER CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 3642 E US Highway 70 Claremont, NC 28610 / US | [2024/21] |
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states Commscope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURK, Morgan C. c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | 02 /
CHAMBERLAIN, John c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | 03 /
LINEHAN, Kevin E. c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17860079.7 | 05.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017US55326 | Priority number, date | US201662406890P | 11.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662406890 P | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018071267 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526888 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
H02J9/062 (EP,US);
H02J7/34 (EP,US);
H02J9/061 (US);
Y02B10/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HOCHEFFIZIENTEN LEISTUNGSUMWANDLUNG | [2019/34] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR HIGH EFFICIENCY POWER CONVERSION | [2019/34] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CONVERSION DE COURANT À HAUT RENDEMENT | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 30.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016190865 (SHIN DONG YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,11-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0020]; figures 1-5; claims 1-20 *[I] 4,7,9,10 | International search | [A]WO0101553 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See the entire document. *; | [Y]US2007229044 (VISAIRO-CRUZ HORACIO [MX], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraph 25; claims 1, 3, 8; and figure 5. *; | [A]US2009152953 (DONG MING-YAO [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *; | [Y]US2009236916 (NISHIMURA KAZUHITO [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs 39-42, 67-84; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2013279226 (OFEK ERAN [IL]) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. * | by applicant | WO2009015331 |