EP3528499 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA Masaru c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17860240.5 | 29.09.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017JP35398 | Priority number, date | JP20160202225 | 14.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016202225 | [2019/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018070267 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528499 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/593, H04N19/105, H04N19/11, H04N19/136, H04N19/176, H04N19/70 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
H04N19/11 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/136 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/593 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/34] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD | [2019/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2019 | Translation filed | 08.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 08.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - Y-J CHANG ET AL, "Arbitrary reference tier for intra directional modes", 3. JVET MEETING; 26-5-2016 - 1-6-2016; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JVET/,, (20160525), no. JVET-C0043-v2, XP030150135 [X] 1-4,6,8 * pages 1, 2 * [I] 5,7 | [A] - Y-J CHANG ET AL, "Suggested Software for Multiple Reference Tiers in EE6", 4. JVET MEETING; 15-10-2016 - 21-10-2016; CHENGDU; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JVET/,, (20161010), no. JVET-D0131-v2, XP030150387 [A] 1-8 * pages 1, 2 * | International search | [YA]JP2013081100 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP) [Y] 9-11, 15, 16 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0007] (Family: none) * [A] 1-8, 12-14; | [YA]JP2015035659 (JVC KENWOOD CORP) [Y] 9-11, 15, 16 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0004], [0019] to [0020], [0030] to [0047]; fig. 4 to 13 (Family: none) * [A] 1-8, 12-14; | [A]WO2008102805 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2010/0027655 A1 & EP 2129135 A1 & KR 10-2009-0110336 A & CN 101682774 A *; | [A]JP2005318497 (NTT DOCOMO INC) [A] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0003], [0046] to [0062], [0084]; fig. 1 to 5 & US 2005/0163216 A1 paragraphs [0001] to [0005], [0073] to [0089], [0111]; fig. 1 to 5 & EP 1569461 A2 & KR 10-2005-0067083 A & CN 1638484 A *; | [A]JP2013141076 (JVC KENWOOD CORP) [A] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0062] to [0066] (Family: none) * | [YA] - YAO-JEN CHANG et al., "Arbitrary reference tier for intra directional modes", Joint Video Exploration Team (JVET) of ITU-T SG 16 WP3 and ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11 3rd Meeting:Geneva (JVET-C0043, (20160517), no. JVET-C0043, pages 1 - 3, XP030150134 [Y] 9-11, 15,16 * . * [A] 1-8, 12-14 | [YA] - JIAHAO LI et al., "Multiple line-based intra prediction", Joint Video Exploration Team(JVET) of ITU-T SG 16 WP3 and ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11 3rd Meeting:Geneva(JVET-C0071, (20160517), pages 1 - 6 [Y] 9-11, 15, 16 * . * [A] 1-8, 12-14 |