EP3527621 - RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-1, Yaesu 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0028 / JP | [2023/18] |
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7122 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Yosuke c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
MATSUNAGA, Koji c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
KAWABE, Kuniaki c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 04 /
KANAYA, Hirotaka c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 17860263.7 | 11.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017JP36815 | Priority number, date | JP20160202820 | 14.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016202820 | [2019/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018070425 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3527621 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08K7/14, C08L23/30, // C08G63/181, C08G63/183 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,KR);
C08J5/043 (KR);
C08K3/013 (KR);
C08K7/14 (EP,KR);
C08L23/30 (EP,KR);
C08G63/181 (EP);
C08G63/183 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08K3/013, C08L23/30 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08K7/14, C08L23/30 (EP) |
Former IPC [2019/34] | C08L67/02, C08K7/14, C08L23/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMARTIKEL | [2019/34] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE | [2019/34] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ET ARTICLE MOULÉ | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2019 | Translation filed | 11.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 09.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/05] | 12.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP2048199 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,3-7,9 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0117]; examples 3, 4, 7; tables 1, 2 *[A] 2,8; | [YA]US2014128504 (LU BING [US]) [Y] 1,3-7,9 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0094]; example Sample 3; table 1 * [A] 2,8 | International search | [A]JPS5550025 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-9 * , claims, example 3 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2006037103 (CLARIANT GMBH) [X] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0052]-[0053], examples & US 2006/0025508 A1, claims, paragraphs [0043]-[0044], examples & EP 1619010 A1 *; | [X]JP2008280498 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP) [X] 1-5, 7-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0034]-[0035], [0046]-[0073], examples & US 2010/0309571 A1, claims, paragraphs [0037]-[0038], [0049]-[0078], examples & WO 2008/015934 A1 & EP 2048199 A1 & CN 101501133 A *; | [A]JP2010270177 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP) [A] 1-9* , claims, paragraphs [0021], [0051], [0072] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2009144146 | WO2011055803 | JP2015028187 | JP2016202820 |