EP3526442 - CONSTANT ENTRANCE HOLE PERFORATING GUN SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GeoDynamics, Inc. 10500 West Interstate 20 Millsap, TX 76066 / US | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Wenbo c/o GeoDynamics, Inc. 10500 W. Interstate 20 Millsap, TX 76066 / US | 02 /
SNIDER, Philip M. c/o GeoDynamics, Inc. 10500 W. Interstate 20 Millsap, TX 76066 / US | 03 /
HARDESTY, John T. c/o GeoDynamics, Inc. 10500 W. Interstate 20 Millsap, TX 76066 / US | 04 /
WESSON, David S. c/o GeoDynamics, Inc. 10500 W. Interstate 20 Millsap, TX 76066 / US | [2021/18] |
Former [2019/34] | 01 /
YANG, Wenbo c/o Geodynamics Inc. 10500 W. Interstate 20 Millsap, TX 76066 / US | ||
02 /
SNIDER, Philip M. c/o Geodynamics Inc. 10500 W. Interstate 20 Millsap, TX 76066 / US | |||
03 /
HARDESTY, John T. c/o Geodynamics Inc. 10500 W. Interstate 20 Millsap, TX 76066 / US | |||
04 /
WESSON, David S. c/o Geodynamics Inc. 10500 W. Interstate 20 Millsap, TX 76066 / US | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17860542.4 | 09.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017US55791 | Priority number, date | US201662407896P | 13.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662407896 P | US201615352191 | 15.11.2016 Original published format: US201615352191 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018071342 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526442 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/117, E21B43/119, E21B43/26, F42B1/028 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
E21B43/117 (EP,US);
E21B43/116 (US);
E21B43/119 (EP,US);
E21B43/26 (EP,US);
F42B1/028 (EP,US);
F42B3/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | E21B43/117, F42B1/028, F42B3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | PISTOLENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR KONSTANTE EINGANGSÖFFNUNGSPERFORATION | [2019/34] | English: | CONSTANT ENTRANCE HOLE PERFORATING GUN SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2019/34] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CANON DE PERFORATION DE TROU D'ENTRÉE CONSTANT | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 30.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP19164446.7 / EP3578751 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5859383 (DAVISON DAVID K [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14,20,21 * column 1, lines 5-11 * * column 6, line 53 - column 9, line 30; figure 1a * [Y] 19 [I] 3-13; | [XI]US2003037692 (LIU LIQING [CA]) [X] 1,2,14,20,21 * paragraphs [0007] , [ 144] - [0046]; figures 11, 12 * [I] 3-13; | [YA]US2004118607 (BROOKS JAMES E [US], et al) [Y] 19 * paragraphs [0029] - [0034]; figures 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 9, 10 *[A] 1-13; | [X]US8887609 (CHERRY CHRISTOPHER R [US]) [X] 15-18 * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 19 * * column 7, line 23 - line 38 * * column 8, line 7 - line 14; figures 3A, 3B, 5 *; | [XI] - M.G Vigil, "Optimized conical shaped charge design using the SCAP Code", Sand Report, United States, doi:10.2172/6807425, (19880901), pages 1 - 87, URL: https://prod-ng.sandia.gov/techlib-noauth/access-control.cgi/1988/881790.pdf, (20190401), XP055576053 [X] 1,2,20,21 * pages 10-16; figure 2; table 2 * [I] 3-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2172/6807425 | International search | [A]US6363991 (HUANG TE-MING [TW]) [A] 1, 3-4, 7-32 * , see entire document. *; | [A]US2014076132 (BIRD DEAN VERNELL [US]) [A] 1, 3-4, 7-32 * , see entire document. *; | [A]US2015176384 (CASTILLO HOMERO C [US], et al) [A] 1, 3-4, 7-32 * , see entire document. *; | [A]US2016349021 (COLLIER NICHOLAS [US], et al) [A] 1, 3-4, 7-32* , see entire documen * | by applicant | US5859383 | US8887609 |