EP3531754 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE, COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/35] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUICHI, Sho c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 17862831.9 | 28.09.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017JP35342 | Priority number, date | JP20160206026 | 20.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016206026 | [2019/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018074177 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3531754 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3531754 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14, H04W52/28, H04W52/24, // H04W52/06, H04W52/38 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP,RU,US);
H04W52/241 (RU,US);
H04W52/243 (EP,US);
H04W52/283 (EP,RU,US);
H04W52/365 (US);
H04W52/367 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/35] | H04W52/24, H04W16/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2019/35] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE, COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2019/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2019 | Translation filed | 12.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 02.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2017 | AL | 08.09.2021 | AT | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | ES | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | IT | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | MK | 08.09.2021 | MT | 08.09.2021 | PL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | TR | 08.09.2021 | IE | 28.09.2021 | LU | 28.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | CH | 30.09.2021 | LI | 30.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 28.09.2017 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
TR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 28.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 28.09.2017 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 28.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 28.09.2017 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 28.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 28.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 28.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 28.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 28.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 28.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010330919 (GURNEY DAVID P [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0068] *; | [Y]WO2013161281 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | US2015119014 [ ] (MURAOKA KAZUSHI [JP], et al) [ ] * figures 2-7, 13 * * paragraphs [0039] - [0078] * * paragraphs [0109] - [0120] *; | [A]US2016128000 (FURUICHI SHO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-9B * * paragraphs [0002] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0056] - [0194] * * paragraphs [0216] - [0221] *; | [Y] - RIKU JANTTI ET AL, "Aggregate interference with FCC and ECC white space usage rules: Case study in Finland", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON NEW FRONTIERS IN DYNAMIC SPECTRUM ACCESS NETWORKS ; (AACHEN) : 2011.05.03-06DYSPAN ; (AACHEN) : 2011.05.03-06IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON DYNAMIC SPECTRUM ACCESS NETWORKS ; (AACHEN) : 2011.05.03-06, US, (20110501), doi:10.1109/DYSPAN.2011.5936252, ISBN 978-1-4577-0177-1, pages 599 - 602, XP055621535 [Y] 1-9 * figure 2 * * sections II, III; pages 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DYSPAN.2011.5936252 | [A] - "ECCREP159", ETSI DRAFT; ECCREP159, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20120704), vol. Etsi_Cenelec, pages 1 - 160, XP014085573 [A] 1-9 * sections 2-5; pages 9-52 * * sections 8, 9; pages 60-74 * * Annex 1; pages 83-87 * * Annexes 4-8; pages 104-144 * * Annexes 10-12; pages 147-159 * | International search | [Y]WO2013161281 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0019]-0060], [0091]-[0131], fig. 2-7, 13 & US 2015/0119014 A1, paragraphs [0039] - [0078] , [0109] - [0120], fig. 2-7, 13 *; | [Y]WO2015159411 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 5-7* , paragraphs [0032]-[0033], fig. 5 & US 2017/0013474 A1 paragraphs [0045]-[0046], fig. 5 & EP 3133855 A1 *; | [Y] - MIYAGI, TOSHIFUMI, "An Efficient Zone Design for WIPAS using Vertical Service Area Division Method", Proceedings of the 2009 IEICE Communications Society Conference, (20090915), page 467, XP009513514 [Y] 1-9 |