EP3531742 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/35] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Yusuke c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
SUGAYA, Shigeru c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 17865942.1 | 16.08.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017JP29480 | Priority number, date | JP20160208179 | 24.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016208179 | [2019/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018079015 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3531742 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/06, H04W72/04, H04W84/12 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
H04W48/20 (EP);
H04W28/06 (US);
H04W72/04 (US);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2019/35] | English: | COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2019/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2019 | Translation filed | 17.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 06.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1758303 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1,10,11,13-15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029]; figure 3 * [A] 2-9,12; | [XA]WO2008140325 (TELENOR ASA [NO], et al) [X] 1,10,11,13-15 * page 21, line 21 - page 23, line 6; figures 5-7 * [A] 2-9,12; | [XA]US2011040969 (YAO ZONGMING [CN], et al) [X] 1,10,11,13-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] *[A] 2-9,12; | [XI]US2016302122 (MASINI GINO LUCA [SE], et al) [X] 1,10,11,13-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016] * [I] 2-9,12; | [XA] - WIM DIEPSTRATEN LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES NIEUWEGEIN, "Draft Inter Access Point Protocol (lAPP) Specification. ; 1196108_scan", IEEE DRAFT; 1196108_SCAN, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20150115), vol. 802.11, pages 1 - 24, XP068086040 [X] 1,10,11,13-15 * paragraph [02.0]; figure 3 * * paragraph [02.5] * [A] 2-9,12 | International search | [XYA]JP2010529730 (LG Electronics Inc.) [X] 1, 11-16, 17-20 * , paragraphs [0036] to [0040] & US 2008/0298333 A1 paragraphs [0056] to [0060] & WO 2008/147130 A2 & KR 10-2009-0132650 A & CN 101682539 A & TW 200915783 A * [Y] 9, 10 [A] 2-8; | [XYA]WO2016136116 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1, 11-16, 17-20 * , paragraph [0003]; fig. 9 & US 2017/0257817 A1 paragraph [0003]; fig. 9 & AU 2015384676 A * [Y] 9, 10 [A] 2-8; | [A] - "Remaining issues of Downlink Control Signalling for CoMP", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#70 Rl-123142, (20120813), XP050661034 [A] 5 * , Section 2.2 * |