EP3533896 - GRAIN-ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Posco (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Chang Soo c/o POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Kyu-Seok c/o POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 03 /
JOO, Hyung Don c/o POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 04 /
SEO, Jin-Wook c/o POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Woo-Sin c/o POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 17866141.9 | 25.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017KR11849 | Priority number, date | KR20160139937 | 26.10.2016 Original published format: KR 20160139937 | [2019/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018080167 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3533896 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3533896 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/16, H01F1/18, C21D8/02, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
C21D8/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/46 (US);
C21D6/005 (US);
C21D6/008 (US);
C21D8/005 (US);
C21D8/0226 (KR);
C21D8/0236 (KR);
C21D8/0263 (KR);
C21D8/1272 (US);
C22C38/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (KR,US);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/005 (KR,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01F1/16 (EP);
C22C2202/02 (US);
H01F1/14775 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/36] | C22C38/02, C22C38/00, C22C38/06, C22C38/04, C21D8/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KORNORIENTIERTES ELEKTRISCHES STAHLBLECH UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/36] | English: | GRAIN-ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2019/36] | French: | TÔLE EN ACIER ÉLECTRIQUE À GRAINS ORIENTÉS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2019 | Translation filed | 22.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 15.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2017 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | ES | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | MT | 31.03.2021 | NL | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | TR | 31.03.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | GB | 25.10.2021 | IE | 25.10.2021 | LU | 25.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | FR | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 25.10.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
TR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
GB | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 25.10.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
GB | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HU | 25.10.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
GB | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 25.10.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
GB | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
GB | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
GB | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/41] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
GB | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
GB | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
GB | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0915179 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]DE20316160U (TUREVSKY BORIS [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0006] * * table 1 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP1580289 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1840906 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [YA]EP1889927 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,3-7,9-13 * abstract * * claim 7 * * tables 6-2 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029] * [A] 2,8; | [YA]WO2016098917 (POSCO [KR]) [Y] 1,3-7,9-13 * abstract * * claims 1,8-11 * [A] 2,8 | International search | [A]JP2005264280 (JFE STEEL KK) [A] 1-13 * See paragraph [00341 and claims 1,3. *; | [A]KR20140084770 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-13* See paragraphs [0037]-[0038] and claims 1, 5. *; | [A]KR20150073551 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-13 * See claims 1-3, 6. *; | [A]KR20150074925 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0044] and claim 1. *; | [A]KR20160072704 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-13 * See claims 1-2,8. * |