EP3535995 - NETWORK SELECTION WITH STATELESS NETWORK FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDRAMOULI, Devaki 3532 Thorp Springs Drive Plano TX 75025 / US | 02 /
CASATI, Alessio 34 Molesham Way West Molesey Surrey KT8 1NT / GB | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 17866362.1 | 03.11.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017US59938 | Priority number, date | US201662417004P | 03.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662417004 P | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018102073 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3535995 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/04 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
H04W8/04 (EP,US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04L67/142 (US);
H04W80/10 (US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | NETZWERKAUSWAHL MIT ZUSTANDSLOSEN NETZWERKFUNKTIONEN | [2019/37] | English: | NETWORK SELECTION WITH STATELESS NETWORK FUNCTIONS | [2019/37] | French: | SÉLECTION DE RÉSEAU À FONCTIONS DE RÉSEAU SANS ÉTAT | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 03.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 17.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014206314 (ABDALLAS ISAM [US]) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] ** paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0046] *; | [X] - SAMSUNG, "Update on solution 1.2: Extending the Slice Type components of an MDD vector", vol. SA WG2, no. Kaohsiung City, Taiwan; 20161017 - 20161021, (20161016), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-165853 UPDATE ON SOLUTION 1.2 - EXTENDING THE SLICE TYPE COMPONENTS OF AN MDD VECTOR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-0, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/SA2/Docs/, (20161016), XP051155434 [X] 1-25 * paragraphs 6.1.2, 6.1.2.2.1, 6.1.2.2.3.1 and 6.1.2.2.3.2 * * figures 6.1.2.2.3.1-1 and 6.1.2.2.3.2-1 * | [A] - DRAFTING EDITOR (NOKIA) ET AL, "Interim Agreements based on Way forward on Solutions for Key Issue 1 on Network Slicing", vol. SA WG2, no. Kaohsiung, Taiwan; 20161017 - 20161021, (20161024), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-166097-NETSLICING_PROPOSED AGREEMENTS-MERGED- REVISION 3 UPDATED DURING TUE NG SESSION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_117_Kaohsiung_City/Docs/, (20161024), XP051170058 [A] 1-25 * Paragraph 4 * | [A] - NOKIA, "Reply to SM and MM decoupling: S2-165642", vol. SA WG2, no. Kaohsiung city, Taiwan; 20161017 - 20161021, (20161024), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-165911 REPLY S2-165642-DISCUSSION ON SM AND MM DECOUPLING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_117_Kaohsiung_City/Docs/, (20161024), XP051169894 [A] 1-25 | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Study on New Radio Access Technology; Radio Access Architecture and Interfaces (Release 14)", (20161101), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-162527_TR 38 801 V060, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG3_Iu/TSGR3_93bis/Docs/, (20161101), XP051163420 [A] 1-25 * Paragraph 8.2.3 * |