EP3536846 - ANTI-OVERFLOW DEVICE OF DRUM WATER INJECTION PORT, AND DRUM WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Washing Machine Co., Ltd. No.1 Haier Road Hi-Tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Bencai No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
LIANG, Qidui No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
LI, Jingde No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstraße 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17866421.5 | 01.11.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017CN108933 | Priority number, date | CN201610935852 | 01.11.2016 Original published format: CN201610935852 | [2019/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018082564 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536846 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08, // D06F37/26 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
D06F37/267 (EP,US);
D06F39/081 (EP,CN,US);
D06F39/08 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | ÜBERLAUFSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG EINER TROMMELWASSEREINSPRITZÖFFNUNG SOWIE TROMMELWASCHMASCHINE | [2019/37] | English: | ANTI-OVERFLOW DEVICE OF DRUM WATER INJECTION PORT, AND DRUM WASHING MACHINE | [2019/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTI-DÉBORDEMENT D'ORIFICE D'INJECTION D'EAU DANS UN TAMBOUR, ET MACHINE À LAVER À TAMBOUR | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2019 | Translation filed | 22.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 20.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/38] | 04.05.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN104878569 (WUXI LITTLE SWAN CO LTD) [X] 1,5,10 * see machine translation;; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2004163422 (KIM JONG SEOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044]; figures 4A, 5 * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054] *; | [A]GB1186799 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE [IT]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 6 - line 66; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008012341 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-5 * |