EP3535194 - DRONE DELIVERY PACKAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WestRock Shared Services, LLC 1000 Abernathy Road NE Atlanta GA 30328 / US | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Kenneth C. 4393 Cades Pointe Marietta, Georgia 30066 / US | 02 /
BUSCEMA, Craig W. 9971 Devonshire Street Douglasville Georgia 30135 / US | [2019/41] |
Former [2019/37] | 01 /
SMITH, Kenneth C. 45 Parklin Drive Hiram Georgia 30141 / US | ||
02 /
BUSCEMA, Craig W. 9971 Devonshire Street Douglasville Georgia 30135 / US | Representative(s) | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Rule 13 Whitehall Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 17868412.2 | 27.10.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017US58690 | Priority number, date | US201662417651P | 04.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662417651 P | US201662418318P | 07.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662418318 P | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018085136 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3535194 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/32, B65D5/68, B65D5/24, B65D5/36 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
B65D5/68 (EP);
B65D5/64 (US);
B65D5/2038 (EP);
B65D5/2047 (EP,US);
B65D5/24 (EP,US);
B65D5/32 (EP,US);
B65D5/36 (EP);
B65D5/5028 (EP);
B65D5/685 (EP);
B65D2313/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSSYSTEM ZUR DROHNENLIEFERUNG | [2019/37] | English: | DRONE DELIVERY PACKAGING SYSTEM | [2019/37] | French: | SYSTÈME D'EMBALLAGE POUR DISTRIBUTION PAR DRONE | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 11.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2073272 (WELLMAN CHARLES P) [X] 9 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 50; figures 1-17 * [Y] 8 [I] 1-4; | [X]US5050794 (WISCHUSEN III HENRY [US]) [X] 1,4,9 * column 5, lines 67-68; figures 1-27 ** column 6, lines 1-27 *; | [Y]US2016185466 (DREANO JR FRANK [US]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0047]; figure 2 * | International search | [A]US2366304 (WILLIAMS BENJAMIN M, et al) [A] 2, 3, 5-7 * Entire document especially page 2, col 1, In 6-36 and figs. 3 and 4 *; | [A]US3900104 (HARNED FREDERICK G) [A] 2, 3, 5-7 * Entire document especially fig. 1 *; | [XYA]US5050794 (WISCHUSEN III HENRY [US]) [X] 1, 4, 9 * Entire document especially col 5, In 67-68; col 6, In 1-27 figs. 1, 2, and 6-8 * [Y] 8 [A] 2, 3, 5-7; | [A]US5100016 (WISCHUSEN III HENRY [US]) [A] 1-9* Entire document *; | [A]US5148973 (ZIMMERMANN JOHN [CA]) [A] 1-9 * Entire document *; | [A]US6863212 (STONE JAMES L [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * Entire document *; | [A]US2007051785 (ROESSIGER CLAUDE [US]) [A] 1-9 * Entire document *; | [Y]US2016185466 (DREANO JR FRANK [US]) [Y] 8 * Entire document especially para [0047] and fig. 2 * | by applicant | US2073272 | US9340317 |