EP3582897 - A FLOTATION ARRANGEMENT, ITS USE, A PLANT AND A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Finland Oy Rauhalanpuisto 9 02230 Espoo / FI | [2023/43] |
Former [2023/04] | For all designated states Metso Outotec Finland Oy Lokomonkatu 3 33900 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states Metso Minerals Oy Lokomonkatu 3 33900 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2019/52] | For all designated states Outotec (Finland) Oy Rauhalanpuisto 9 02230 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURKE, Peter 22 Maud Rd. Maida Vale Perth 6057 / AU | 02 /
RINNE, Antti Itätuulenkuja 1 A 14 02100 Espoo / FI | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 17868514.5 | 15.02.2017 | [2019/52] | WO2017FI50094 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018150076 | Date: | 23.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3582897 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 23.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B03D1/14, C22B1/00, B03D1/24, B03D1/08 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
B03D1/24 (EP,EA,US);
B03D1/1406 (EP,AU,CN,EA,US);
B03D1/14 (CN,EA);
B03D1/06 (AU,EA);
B03D1/087 (EP,EA,US);
C22B1/00 (EA,US);
B03D1/1456 (AU,EA);
B03D1/1462 (AU,EA);
B03D1/1468 (AU,EA);
B03D2203/02 (CN,EA,US);
B03D2203/025 (EA,US);
B03D2203/04 (EA,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | B03D1/14, C22B1/00, B03D1/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | FLOTATIONSANORDNUNG, DEREN VERWENDUNG, ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN | [2019/52] | English: | A FLOTATION ARRANGEMENT, ITS USE, A PLANT AND A METHOD | [2019/52] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE FLOTTAISON, SON UTILISATION, INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉ | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 11.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4460459 (SHAW DOUGLAS R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12-18 * figure 1 * [I] 4-11,19,20; | [A]US5285972 (NOTEBAART CORNELIUS W [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1a, 1b *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Flotación de Sulfuros de Cobre", (20161023), URL: https://www.911metallurgist.com/metalurgia/flotacion-de-sulfuros-de-cobre/, (20181206), XP055531095 [A] 1-20 * page 9 * | International search | [A]EP0476354 (ERZ & KOHLEFLOTATION GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-79 * abstract; column 4, line 29-58; figure 1 *; | [X]US5285972 (NOTEBAART CORNELIUS W [NL], et al) [X] 1-79 * abstract; column 1, lines 5-10; column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 31; column 3, lines 8-37; column 4, lines 10-65; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO9924169 (CLEVELAND CLIFFS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-79 * abstract; page 1, lines 1-24; page 13, line 30 - page 18, line 33; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5951875 (KANEL JEFFREY SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-79* abstract, figure 6 * | by applicant | US4460459 |