EP3538284 - ROTARY NOZZLE SPRINKLER WITH ORBITAL DIFFUSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nelson Irrigation Corporation 848 Airport Road Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US | [2021/48] |
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states Nelson Irrigation Corporation 848 Airport Road Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SESSER, George L. c/o Nelson Irrigation Corporation 848 Airport Road Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US | 02 /
NELSON, Craig B. c/o Nelson Irrigation Corporation 848 Airport Road Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US | 03 /
NELSON, Barton R. c/o Nelson Irrigation Corporation 848 Airport Road Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US | [2022/28] |
Former [2019/38] | 01 /
SESSER, George, L. c/o Nelson Irrigation Corporation 848 Airport Road Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US | ||
02 /
NELSON, Craig, B. c/o Nelson Irrigation Corporation 848 Airport Road Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US | |||
03 /
NELSON, Barton, R. c/o Nelson Irrigation Corporation 848 Airport Road Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/28] |
Former [2019/38] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17868897.4 | 08.11.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017US60593 | Priority number, date | US201662420216P | 10.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662420216 P | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018089462 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3538284 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3538284 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05B3/08, B05B3/00, B05B3/02, B05B3/04, B05B3/06, B05B3/10, B05B3/14 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
B05B3/0486 (EP,US);
B05B3/008 (EP,US);
B05B3/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHDÜSENSPRINKLER MIT ORBITALEM DIFFUSOR | [2019/38] | English: | ROTARY NOZZLE SPRINKLER WITH ORBITAL DIFFUSER | [2019/38] | French: | ARROSEUR À BUSE ROTATIVE COMPRENANT UN DIFFUSEUR ORBITAL | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 06.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2017 | AL | 13.07.2022 | CY | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | IT | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | MK | 13.07.2022 | NL | 13.07.2022 | PL | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | GB | 08.11.2022 | IE | 08.11.2022 | LU | 08.11.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 08.11.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.11.2017 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.11.2022 | ||
IE | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
GB | 08.11.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
LU | 08.11.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 13.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5377914 (CHRISTEN HANS [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1389490 (NELSON IRRIGATION CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034]; figures 16-20 *; | [X]US2006006253 (NELSON CRAIG B [US]) [X] 1,4,10-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2006108445 (PINCH DANIEL R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2254270 (COLES WALTER H, et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US3743183 (MALCOLM W) [Y] 14 * entire document *; | [Y]US4886211 (COHEN AMIR [IL]) [Y] 5-8, 10-12, 18, 20 * entire document *; | [XY]US5377914 (CHRISTEN HANS [US]) [X] 1, 2, 13, 15, 16, 19 * entire document * [Y] 3-8, 10-12, 14, 17, 18, 20; | [A]US2006006253 (NELSON CRAIG B [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2006108445 (PINCH DANIEL R [US], et al) [Y] 7, 8 * entire document *; | [A]US2013327846 (SESSER GEORGE L [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]US2015224520 (KIM EUGENE EZEKIEL [US], et al) [Y] 3-8, 17, 18, 20 * entire document * | by applicant | US5377914 | EP1389490 | US2006006253 | US2006108445 | US7395977 |