EP3540784 - SCHOTTKY BARRIER DIODE AND ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 2-5-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-6128 / JP | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRABAYASHI, Jun c/o TDK Corporation 2-5-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku 103-6128 Tokyo / JP | 02 /
MATSUO, Yutaka c/o TDK Corporation 2-5-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku 103-6128, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
FUJITA, Minoru c/o TDK Corporation 2-5-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku 103-6128, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
ARIMA, Jun c/o TDK Corporation 2-5-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku 103-6128, Tokyo / JP | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 17869159.8 | 11.09.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017JP32612 | Priority number, date | JP20160218652 | 09.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016218652 | [2019/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018088018 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3540784 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3540784 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/872, H01L21/28, H01L29/41, H01L29/47, H01L29/06, H01L29/24, H01L29/417 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
H01L29/872 (EP,US);
H01L21/02414 (US);
H01L21/02565 (US);
H01L21/02576 (US);
H01L21/02631 (US);
H01L21/28 (EP,US);
H01L29/0657 (EP);
H01L29/24 (EP);
H01L29/41 (US);
H01L29/417 (EP);
H01L29/47 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L2924/10158 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/38] | H01L29/872, H01L21/28, H01L29/41, H01L29/47 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHOTTKY-BARRIERE-DIODE UND ELEKTRONISCHE SCHALTUNG DAMIT | [2019/38] | English: | SCHOTTKY BARRIER DIODE AND ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT PROVIDED WITH SAME | [2019/38] | French: | DIODE À BARRIÈRE DE SCHOTTKY ET CIRCUIT ÉLECTRONIQUE POURVU DE CETTE DERNIÈRE | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2019 | Translation filed | 06.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 10.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | IE | 11.09.2023 | LU | 11.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | FR | 16.10.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
IE | 11.09.2023 | ||
LU | 11.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
FR | 16.10.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
IE | 11.09.2023 | ||
LU | 11.09.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 11.09.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 11.09.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2006156658 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7 * Fig. 1 and related text *; | [Y]JP2009182217 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [Y] 2,4-11 * paragraphs [0031] - [0037]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]JP2013201413 (ROHM CO LTD) [Y] 1-7,11 * Fig. 2, 8 and related text *; | [Y]US2015076520 (TSUJI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7* Fig. 5 and related text *; | [YD]JP2016031953 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK, et al) [YD] 1-11 * paragraphs [0033] - [0071]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]JP2002170963 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-7, 11 * , paragraphs [0011], [0020] to [0021], [0028], [0031] to [0034], [0072] to [0073]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010182958 (SEIKO INSTR INC) [A] 8-10* , paragraphs [0008], [0013], [0017] to [0018]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013102081 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 1-7, 11 * , paragraphs [0014], [0043] to [0046]; fig. 1 & US 2014/0332823 A1 paragraphs [0045], [0072] to [0075]; fig. 1 & EP 2779242 A1 & WO 2013/069728 A1 & TW 201338155 A & CN 103918082 A & KR 10-2014-0095080 A *; | [A]JP2013201413 (ROHM CO LTD) [A] 8-10 * , paragraphs [0005] to [0006], [0029] to [0034]; fig. 2, 5 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2016031953 |