EP3539350 - METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT FOR RECEIVING DOWNLINK SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YI, Seungjune IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sunyoung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17869354.5 | 10.11.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017KR12728 | Priority number, date | US201662421291P | 13.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662421291 P | US201662421972P | 14.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662421972 P | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018088840 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3539350 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/20, H04W72/02, H04W52/02, H04W68/02, // H04W76/28 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
H04W68/02 (EP,US);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W74/006 (US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W76/28 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/38] | H04W76/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BENUTZERGERÄT ZUM EMPFANGEN VON DOWNLINK-SIGNALEN | [2019/38] | English: | METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT FOR RECEIVING DOWNLINK SIGNALS | [2019/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR DESTINÉS À LA RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAUX DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 09.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2265079 (HTC CORP [TW]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] * * figures 2,4,5 *; | [Y]US2011002281 (TERRY STEPHEN E [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0084] *; | [A] - CATT, "Small data transmission in inactive state", vol. RAN WG2, no. Kaohsiung; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161009), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-166118, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20161009), XP051150736 [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [001.] , [002.] * * paragraphs [03.2] , [03.3] * | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "DRX principles for NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161104), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-167707 DRX PRINCIPLES IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_96/Docs/, (20161104), XP051192253 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "DL data transmission in RRC_INACTIVE", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, Nevada, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161105), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-168546 DL DATA TRANSMISSION IN RRC_INACTIVE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_96/Docs/, (20161105), XP051193091 [A] 1-11 * paragraph [02.2] * | [A] - ERICSSON, "DRX in idle and RRC_INACTIVE state", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, Nevada, U.S.; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161104), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-168488 - DRX IN IDLE AND INACTIVE STATE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_96/Docs/, (20161104), XP051192515 [A] 1-11 * paragraph [001.] - paragraph [003.] * | [XP] - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "Notification triggered DL data transmission in RRC_INACTIVE", vol. RAN WG2, no. Spokane, USA; 20170117 - 20170119, (20170107), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1700440 NOTIFICATION BASED DOWNLINK TRANSMISSION IN RRC_INACTIVE_R1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIP, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_AHs/2017_01_NR/Docs/, (20170107), XP051204005 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2016128129 (KAHTAVA JUSSI [GB], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0057], [0090], [0115]; and claim 1. *; | [Y]WO2015173197 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See page 12, lines 1-6; page 13, lines 3-6; page 14, lines 26-28; and claims 1, 4, 11, 12. *; | [Y]WO2015054886 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 7-8, 17-18 * See claims 1-3. *; | [A]US2016007170 (VAIDYA MAULIK VIJAY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0186]-[0191]; and claims 1-4. *; | [A]US2016044605 (VAJAPEYAM MADHAVAN SRINIVASAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0093]-[0095]; and figure 5. *; | [A]US2013329637 (KODALI SREE RAM [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See claims 12-15. * | by applicant | EP2265079 |