EP3541506 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RETRIEVING AND ANALYZING PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | [2021/15] |
Former [2020/51] | For all designated states Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | ||
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states Celsee Diagnostics, Inc. 46701 Commerce Center Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANDIQUE, Kalyan 46701 Commerce Center Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | 02 /
PAYNE, Austin 46701 Commerce Center Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | 03 /
SHARMA, Vishal 46701 Commerce Center Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | 04 /
GLEASON, Kyle 46701 Commerce Center Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | 05 /
GOGOI, Priyadarshini 46701 Commerce Center Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | 06 /
GANESAN, Karthik 46701 Commerce Center Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | 07 /
BONIFACE, Brian 46701 Commerce Center Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | 08 /
CHOW, Will 46701 Commerce Center Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | Higgs, Jonathan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes, MK9 1NE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17870734.5 | 16.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017US62099 | Priority number, date | US201662423322P | 17.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662423322 P | US201715430833 | 13.02.2017 Original published format: US201715430833 | US201715431977 | 14.02.2017 Original published format: US201715431977 | US201715657553 | 24.07.2017 Original published format: US201715657553 | US201762545251P | 14.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762545251 P | US201715720194 | 29.09.2017 Original published format: US201715720194 | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018094109 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541506 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N35/10, G01N35/00, G01N1/40, G01N15/14, G06K9/00, G06K9/20, C12M1/32, C12M1/26, C12M1/34, C12M1/36, C12M1/00, G01N21/64 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
C12M23/12 (EP,CN);
G01N21/6458 (CN);
B01L3/502761 (EP);
B01L3/5085 (EP);
C12M33/04 (EP,CN);
C12M41/36 (EP,CN);
C12M41/48 (EP,CN);
C12M47/04 (EP,CN);
G01N1/28 (CN);
G01N1/4077 (EP);
G01N15/02 (CN);
G01N15/1433 (EP);
G01N15/1468 (EP);
G01N15/1484 (EP);
G01N21/84 (CN);
G01N35/00029 (EP);
G01N35/10 (CN);
G01N35/1011 (EP);
B01L2200/0668 (EP);
B01L2300/0819 (EP);
B01L2300/0829 (EP);
G01N15/149 (EP);
G01N2015/1006 (EP);
G01N2035/00158 (EP);
G01N2035/1039 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/39] | B01J19/00, B01L3/00, G01N1/28, G01N15/02, G01N35/10, G06T7/00, G06T7/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM RÜCKGEWINNEN UND ANALYSIEREN VON TEILCHEN | [2019/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RETRIEVING AND ANALYZING PARTICLES | [2019/39] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION ET D'ANALYSE DE PARTICULES | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 03.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP23156657.1 / EP4205852 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2007264705 (DODGSON JOHN [GB]) [I] 1,3-6,9,10,12,13,15 * figures 1a,4a-4d,4g, 4i,7,10 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraphs [0041] , [0049] * [Y] 2; | [Y]JP2008136415 (NIKON CORP) [Y] 2 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] *; | [XYI]US2014357511 (HANDIQUE KALYAN [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9,10 * figures 1,2A,3A-3B,4A-4B, 5,7A-7B,8,9,10 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0061] * [Y] 2 [I] 3-6,12,13,15; | [A]WO2015133337 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6,9,10,12,13,15* abstract * | International search | [YA]US6821484 (GREGERSEN SOEREN [DK]) [Y] 4, 6, 7, 13-19, 21 * , col 3, In 12-25; col 5, In 65 to col 6, In 32; col 8, In 22-29; col 11, In 43-38 * [A] 2, 3, 5, 20; | [A]US2014315237 (MASUJIMA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 2, 3, 5, 20* , para [0040], [0062], [0066], [0102] *; | [YA]US2014357511 (HANDIQUE KALYAN [US], et al) [Y] 1, 4, 6-19, 21 * , Figs. 1, 4A, 9, 10; para [0018], [0019], [0027], [0029], [0031], [0034], [0040]-[0051] * [A] 2, 3, 5, 20; | [YA]US2014370612 (BASSLER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 1, 4, 6-19, 21 * , para [0054], [0070], [0107] * [A] 2, 3, 5, 20; | [A]US2016209319 (ADALSTEINSSON VIKTOR A [US], et al) [A] 2, 3, 5, 20 * , para [0008], [0017], [0020], [0021], [0029], [0096] * | by applicant | US2007264705 | US2014357511 |