EP3543212 - SILICA POWDER FOR QUANTITATIVE SUPPLY, PURIFICATION KIT FOR BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL USING SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2019/45] |
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states Mitsubishi-Chemical Foods Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSUKI, Takanobu c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 02 /
ADACHI, Kouichi c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 03 /
SHIMOYAMA, Masaru c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1008251 / JP | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 17870944.0 | 15.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017JP41089 | Priority number, date | JP20160223067 | 16.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016223067 | [2019/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018092804 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543212 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/12, A61K47/04, C01B33/18, C01B37/02, G01N30/88 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
C01B33/18 (EP,US);
B01J20/103 (US);
B01D15/00 (US);
B01J20/28004 (US);
B01J20/28016 (US);
B01J20/28061 (US);
B01J20/28064 (US);
B01J20/28066 (US);
B01J20/28071 (US);
B01J20/28073 (US);
B01J20/28076 (US);
B01J20/28083 (US);
C01B33/12 (US);
C01B37/02 (US);
G01N30/88 (US);
C01P2004/61 (US);
C01P2006/12 (US);
C01P2006/14 (US);
C01P2006/16 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | SILICA-PULVER ZUR QUANTITATIVEN VERSORGUNG, REINIGUNGSKIT FÜR BIOLOGISCHES MATERIAL DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/39] | English: | SILICA POWDER FOR QUANTITATIVE SUPPLY, PURIFICATION KIT FOR BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL USING SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2019/39] | French: | POUDRE DE SILICE POUR ALIMENTATION QUANTITATIVE, KIT DE PURIFICATION POUR MATÉRIAU BIOLOGIQUE L'UTILISANT, ET SA MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2019 | Translation filed | 05.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 17.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/24] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0335175 (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US]) [A] 1* page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 20; examples 1-6 *; | [A]US5403570 (CHEVALLIER YVONICK [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * claims 15-22 *; | [A]EP2690066 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * examples 1-3; claims 1-13 *; | [AD]WO2016017811 (NIPPON KASEI CHEM [JP]) [AD] 1-7 * claims 1-20 * | International search | [A]JPH0986919 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-7* , paragraph [0013] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012211070 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-7 * , claims, examples 1-2 & US 2014/0065423 A1 & EP 2690066 A1 & CN 103249674 A & KR 10-2014-0002673 A *; | [A]WO2016017811 (NIPPON KASEI CHEM [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , claims (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2002080217 | JP2008222552 | JP2011225380 | JP2013230955 | WO2016017811 | JP2016223067 | - E. P. BARRETTL. G. JOYNERP. H. HAKLENDA, J. Amer. Chem. Soc., (19510000), vol. 73, page 373 |