EP3491504 - IMAGE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND APPARATUS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhixuan 1503 15Floor Building No.12 Taiyanggong Middle Road Chaoyang district Beijing100125 / CN | 02 /
ZUO, Li 1503 15 Floor Building No.12 Taiyanggong Middle Road Chaoyang district Beijing 100125 / CN | 03 /
XU, Zijian 1503 15 Floor Building No.12 Taiyanggong Middle Road Chaoyang district Beijing 100125 / CN | 04 /
ZHENG, Wei 1503 15 Floor Building No.12 Taiyanggong Middle Road Chaoyang district Beijing 100125 / CN | 05 /
GU, Jili 1503 15 Floor Building No.12 Taiyanggong Middle Road Chaoyang district Beijing 100125 / CN | 06 /
LIN, Jinbin 1503 15 Floor Building No.12 Taiyanggong Middle Road Chaoyang district Beijing 100125 / CN | 07 /
XIONG, Junjun 1503 15 Floor Building No.12 Taiyanggong Middle Road Chaoyang district Beijing 100125 / CN | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17871827.6 | 16.11.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017KR13047 | Priority number, date | CN20161107300 | 16.11.2016 Original published format: CN201611007300 | KR20170148051 | 08.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170148051 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018093182 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491504 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/58 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
G06F16/51 (EP,US);
G06F16/54 (EP,US);
G06F16/5866 (EP,US);
H04N23/611 (EP,US);
H04N23/63 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/23] | G06F3/0484, G06F3/01, G06F3/0488, G06F3/16, G06F17/30, G06T7/11, G06K9/32, H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | BILDVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2019/23] | English: | IMAGE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND APPARATUS THEREOF | [2019/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'IMAGES ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 16.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.09.2021 | 30.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/50] | 09.08.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/50] | 07.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004044781 (HYMEL JAMES ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-3 ** paragraph [0031] *; | [I]US2011158558 (ZHAO FENG [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 3c3,3e,4,5c,7 * * paragraphs [0031] , [0041] , [0073] *; | [I]US2012294520 (MEI TAO [CN], et al) [I] 1-14 * figures 3B,3C,4 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * | International search | [Y]KR101540113B (CT OF HUMAN CT ED INTERACTION FOR COEXISTENCE [KR]) [Y] 9-10 * See claim 1; and paragraph [0025]. *; | [A]US2015278605 (SEO YONG SEOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claims 11-12; paragraphs [0055]-[0060]; and figure 9. *; | [A]US2015317434 (KONDO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* See claim 1; paragraphs [0194]-[0238]; and figures 2-6. *; | [Y]US2015339380 (ZHANG YANFENG [CN], et al) [Y] 12 * See claims 1, 7; and figure 2. *; | [XY]KR101615969B (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [X] 1-8, 11, 13-15 * See claim 20; paragraphs [0025], [0093]-[0095], [0112]-[0113], [0117], [0121], [0165], [0177]; and figures 5, 18. * [Y] 9-10, 12 | by applicant | US2011158558 | US2012294520 |