EP3541801 - 4-(6-(2-(2,4-DIFLUOROPHENYL)-1.1-DIFLUORO-2-HYDROXY-3-(5-MERCAPTO-1H [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Qiang 11437 Mears Drive Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | 02 /
BABIJ, Nicholas, R. 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | 03 /
LI, Xiaoyong 606 Scenic Drive Midland, MI 48642 / US | 04 /
RYAN, Sarah 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | 05 /
HAO, Yan 3865 Castle Rock Drive Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 17871908.4 | 17.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017US62151 | Priority number, date | US201662423845P | 18.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662423845 P | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018094140 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541801 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, A61K31/4439, A61K31/4196 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | 4-(6-(2-(2,4-DIFLUORPHENYL)-1,1-DIFLUOR-2-HYDROXY-3-(5-MERCAPTO-1H | [2019/39] | English: | 4-(6-(2-(2,4-DIFLUOROPHENYL)-1.1-DIFLUORO-2-HYDROXY-3-(5-MERCAPTO-1H | [2019/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE 4-(6-(2-(2,4-DIFLUOROPHÉNYL)-1.1-DIFLUORO-2-HYDROXY-3-(5-MERCAPTO-1H-1,2,4-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PROPYL)PYRIDIN-3-YL)OXY)BENZONITRILE | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 31.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 20.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO2016187201 (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [AP] 1-14 * example 2 * | International search | [Y]US2016102072 (HOEKSTRA WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 6-10, 14 * See abstract; and paragraphs [0003], [0082], [0208]. *; | [X]WO2012177635 (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 14 * See abstract; pages 85, 91; and claim 1. *; | [X]WO2015143188 (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 14 * See example 7. *; | [Y] - NISHIDE, K. et al., "Synthetic equivalents of benzenethiol and benzyl mercaptan having faint smell: odor reducing effect of trialkylsilyl group", Tetrahedron Letters, (20020000), vol. 43, no. 47, pages 8569 - 8573, XP085006489 [Y] 1-4, 6-10, 14 * See page 8570, left column, paragraph 1; and table 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(02)02052-X | [A] - LIU, Y. et al., "Copper (II)-Catalyzed Single-Step Synthesis of Aryl Thiols from Aryl Halides and 1, 2-Ethanedithiol", Advanced Synthesis & Catalysis, (20150000), vol. 357, pages 2205 - 2212, XP055601957 [A] 1-4, 6-10, 14 * See abstract; scheme 1; and table 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adsc.201400941 | [A] - YAMADA, M. et al., "Preparation and characterization of novel 4-bromo-3,4-dimethyl-l-phenyl-2-phospholene 1-oxide and the analogous phosphorus heterocycles or phospha sugars", Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20100000), vol. 20, pages 5943 - 5946, XP027273597 [A] 1-4, 6-10, 14 * See scheme 3. * |