EP3534443 - USE OF A POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR POTASSIUM ION BATTERY AND USE OF A POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR POTASSIUM ION BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/36] | POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR POTASSIUM ION BATTERY, POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR POTASSIUM ION BATTERY, AND POTASSIUM ION BATTERY | ||
[2021/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo University of Science Foundation 1-3 Kagurazaka Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8601 / JP | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMABA, Shinichi c/o Tokyo University of Science Foundation 1-3 Kagurazaka Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8601 / JP | 02 /
KUBOTA, Kei c/o Tokyo University of Science Foundation 1-3 Kagurazaka Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8601 / JP | 03 /
CHIHARA, Kuniko c/o Tokyo University of Science Foundation 1-3 Kagurazaka Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8601 / JP | 04 /
KATOGI, Akihiro c/o Tokyo University of Science Foundation 1-3 Kagurazaka Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8601 / JP | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/36] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17873670.8 | 20.11.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017JP41726 | Priority number, date | JP20160229130 | 25.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016229130 | [2019/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018097109 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3534443 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3534443 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/58, C01B25/45, C01B25/455, H01M10/054 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
H01M10/054 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/5825 (EP,KR,US);
C01B25/45 (EP,US);
C01B25/455 (EP,US);
C01G31/006 (US);
H01M4/58 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES POSITIVEN ELEKTRODEN-AKTIVMATERIALS FÜR EINE KALIUMIONENBATTERIE UND VERWENDUNG EINER POSITIVEN ELEKTRODE FÜR EINE KALIUMIONENBATTERIE. | [2021/11] | English: | USE OF A POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR POTASSIUM ION BATTERY AND USE OF A POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR POTASSIUM ION BATTERY | [2021/11] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE AU POTASSIUM-ION ET UTILISATION D'UNE ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE AU POTASSIUM-ION | [2021/11] |
Former [2019/36] | POSITIVELEKTRODEN-AKTIVMATERIAL FÜR KALIUMIONENBATTERIE, POSITIVELEKTRODE FÜR EINE KALIUMIONENBATTERIE UND KALIUMIONENBATTERIE | ||
Former [2019/36] | POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR POTASSIUM ION BATTERY, POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR POTASSIUM ION BATTERY, AND POTASSIUM ION BATTERY | ||
Former [2019/36] | MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIES AU POTASSIUM-ION, ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE AU POTASSIUM-ION, ET BATTERIE AU POTASSIUM-ION | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2019 | Translation filed | 31.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 21.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2017 | AL | 14.07.2021 | AT | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | CZ | 14.07.2021 | DK | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | ES | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | IT | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | MT | 14.07.2021 | NL | 14.07.2021 | PL | 14.07.2021 | RO | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SE | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | TR | 14.07.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | NO | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | PT | 15.11.2021 | IE | 20.11.2021 | LU | 20.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 20.11.2017 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
TR | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 20.11.2017 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 20.11.2017 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [T]US2017373310 (WHITTINGHAM M STANLEY [US], et al) [T] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X] - STANISLAV S. FEDOTOV ET AL, "AVPO 4 F (A = Li, K): A 4 V Cathode Material for High-Power Rechargeable Batteries", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, (20160126), vol. 28, no. 2, doi:10.1021/acs.chemmater.5b04065, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 411 - 415, XP055634140 [X] 1-6 * page 411, column r, paragraphs 1, 2 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.chemmater.5b04065 | [X] - DUPRE N ET AL, "Positive electrode materials for lithium batteries based on VOPO"4", SOLID STATE IONICS, NORTH HOLLAND PUB. COMPANY. AMSTERDAM; NL, NL, (20010401), vol. 140, no. 3-4, doi:10.1016/S0167-2738(01)00818-9, ISSN 0167-2738, pages 209 - 221, XP004240066 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 211, column l, paragraph 1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-2738(01)00818-9 | [XI] - MARK L. F. PHILLIPS ET AL, "Electronic effects of substitution chemistry in the potassium titanyl phosphate (KTiOPO4) structure field: structure and optical properties of potassium vanadyl phosphate", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON, US, (19900501), vol. 29, no. 11, doi:10.1021/ic00336a024, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 2158 - 2163, XP055633874 [X] 1-4 * experimental section, par. 1 * * the whole document * [I] 2,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic00336a024 | [X] - FADILA BERRAH ET AL, "The vanadium monophosphates AVOPO4: Synthesis of a second form [beta]-KVOPO4 and structural relationships in the series", SOLID STATE SCIENCES, FR, (20010501), vol. 3, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S1293-2558(00)01146-8, ISSN 1293-2558, pages 477 - 482, XP055634177 [X] 1-4 * abstract * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1293-2558(00)01146-8 | [T] - KUNIKO CHIHARA ET AL, "KVPO 4 F and KVOPO 4 toward 4 volt-class potassium-ion batteries", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, UK, (20170426), vol. 53, no. 37, doi:10.1039/C6CC10280H, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 5208 - 5211, XP055633862 [T] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C6CC10280H | [T] - Chihara ET AL, "KVPO4F and KVOPO4 toward 4 Volt-Class Potassium-Ion Batteries", (20170426), URL: http://www.rsc.org/suppdata/c6/cc/c6cc10280h/c6cc10280h1.pdf, (20191018), XP055633864 [T] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2011023710 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB) [A] 1-6 * , paragraph [0030] & US 2010/0319188 A1, paragraph [0034] & KR 10-2010-0136923 A & KR 10-2017-0040167 A *; | [A]WO2016059907 (UNIV TOKYO SCIENCE FOUNDATION [JP]) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0038]-[0040] & US 2017/0294676 A1, paragraphs [0067]-[0070] & EP 3208870 A1 & KR 10-2017-0045300 A & CN 106797022 A *; | [PX]US9564656 (ZHAMU ARUNA [US], et al) [PX] 1-6 * , claims, page 7, lines 26-39 & WO 2017/048341 A1 *; | [PX]WO2017058061 (FED STATE BUDGETARY EDUCATION INST OF HIGHER EDUCATION LOMONOSOV MOSCOW STATE UNIV [RU]) [PX] 1-6* , page 3, lines 4, 5, page 4, lines 28-32 & RU 2015141117 A * | by applicant | JP2003151549 | WO2016059907 | - CHRISTOPH VAALMA et al., Journal of The Electrochemical Society, (20160000), vol. 163, no. 7, pages A1295 - A1299 | - ALI EFTEKHARI, Journal of Power Souces, (20040000), vol. 126, pages 221 - 228 | JP20160229130 |