EP3527022 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA OF TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, SM | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Youngbum Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Donghan Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KWAK, Yongjun Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Taehyoung Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Seunghoon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2019/34] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17874041.1 | 22.11.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017KR13350 | Priority number, date | US201662425369P | 22.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662425369 P | KR20160170611 | 14.12.2016 Original published format: KR 20160170611 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018097597 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3527022 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3527022 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W24/04, H04W72/00, H04W76/00, H04W52/28, H04W52/32, // H04W28/20, H04W72/04 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
H04W52/322 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (KR);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0098 (EP);
H04W24/04 (EP);
H04W52/283 (EP);
H04W52/325 (EP,US);
H04W56/00 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W56/00, H04W24/04, H04W72/00, H04W76/00, H04W52/28, H04W52/32 | ||
Former IPC [2019/34] | H04W72/04, H04W56/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON DATEN EINES ENDGERÄTS | [2019/34] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA OF TERMINAL | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE DONNÉES DE TERMINAL | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 27.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20217072.6 / EP3829099 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2017 | AL | 30.12.2020 | AT | 30.12.2020 | CY | 30.12.2020 | CZ | 30.12.2020 | DK | 30.12.2020 | EE | 30.12.2020 | FI | 30.12.2020 | HR | 30.12.2020 | LT | 30.12.2020 | LV | 30.12.2020 | MC | 30.12.2020 | PL | 30.12.2020 | RO | 30.12.2020 | RS | 30.12.2020 | SI | 30.12.2020 | SK | 30.12.2020 | SM | 30.12.2020 | BG | 30.03.2021 | NO | 30.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | IS | 30.04.2021 | PT | 30.04.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016302228 (KAZMI MUHAMMAD [SE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] - [0104] - [0136] *; | [I] - MEDIATEK INC, "Discussion on initial access for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160821), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-167542 DISCUSSION ON INITIAL ACCESS IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160821), XP051125968 [I] 1-15 * sections 2.1, 2.2 * | [XP] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Open Issues on BWP", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, NV, USA; 20171127 - 20171201, (20171118), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1720693 OPEN ISSUES ON BWP, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F91/Docs/, (20171118), XP051370154 [XP] 1-15 * sections 2.1, 2.2.6, 2.2.7 * | [XP] - INTERDIGITAL ET AL, "Details of BWP switching operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, U.S.A; 20171127 - 20171201, (20171118), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1720556 (R15 NR WI AI 7341 DETAILS OF BWP SWITCHING OPERATION), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F91/Docs/, (20171118), XP051370043 [XP] 1-15 * sections 1, 2 * | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Support of flexible bandwidth", vol. RAN WG1, no. Lisbon, Portugal; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161009), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1608841, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161009), XP051148895 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2015078300 (XU HAO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0049]-[0080]; and figure 6A. *; | [Y]WO2016036142 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [140]-[143]. *; | [Y] - ZTE et al., "Considerations on SS block design", RI-1611268, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #87, Reno, USA, (20161105), XP051189832 [Y] 1-15 * See sections 1, 2; and figure 1. * | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "Carrier raster and synchronization signal transmission", RI-1609114, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #86bis, Lisbon, Portugal, (20160930), XP051158429 [Y] 3, 7, 11, 15 * See section 2. * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Multiplexing of synchronization signals and system information delivery channels for below 6 GHz and above 6 GHz", RI-1609111, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #86bis, Lisbon, Portugal, (20160930), XP051158427 [A] 1-15 * See sections 2, 3. * |