EP3544431 - USE OF A DIFLUORO-(2-HYDROXYPROPYL)PYRIDINE COMPOUND AS A FUNGICIDE FOR CONTROL OF PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI OF RICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Yi-hsiou No. 56, Alley 336 Gusong West Lane Pingtung City 90071 / CN | 02 /
GALLUP, Courtney Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 17874226.8 | 22.11.2017 | [2019/40] | WO2017US62984 | Priority number, date | US201662425581P | 22.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662425581 P | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018098256 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3544431 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/653 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
A01N43/653 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER DIFLUOR-(2-HYDROXYPROPYL)PYRIDIN-VERBINDUNG ALS FUNGIZID ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PHYTOPATHOGENEN PILZEN VON REIS | [2019/40] | English: | USE OF A DIFLUORO-(2-HYDROXYPROPYL)PYRIDINE COMPOUND AS A FUNGICIDE FOR CONTROL OF PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI OF RICE | [2019/40] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN COMPOSÉ DIFLUORO-(2-HYDROXYPROPYL)PYRIDINE COMME FONGICIDE POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES CHAMPIGNONS PHYTOPATHOGÈNES DU RIZ | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 20.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2014193974 (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [I] 1-6 * page 61; compound F2 * * page 39, lines 10-16 * * page 39, lines 31, 32 *; | [IP]WO2016187201 (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [IP] 1-6 * claims 1-8 * | International search | [X]WO2014193974 (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * See claim 1; Table 1; page 25, lines 18-23; page 32, lines 13-25; page 39, lines 25-34; page 40, lines 1-4. *; | [A]US8748461 (HOEKSTRA WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * See claims 3, 26-28; columns 31-32. *; | [A]WO2010146113 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * See the whole document. *; | [A]WO9307139 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-6 * See the whole document. *; | [PX]WO2016187201 (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [PX] 1-6 * See claims 1, 8; paragraph [00133]; Table 1; Example 2. * |