EP3418543 - ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/52] | CONTROL APPARATUS FOR ENGINE | ||
[2021/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Atsushi c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
SUEOKA, Masanari c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Kota c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
URUSHIHARA, Tomonori c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 17874667.3 | 25.08.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017JP30640 | Priority number, date | WO2016JP84616 | 22.11.2016 Original published format: PCT/JP2016/084616 | [2018/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018096751 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3418543 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3418543 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02D45/00, F02B23/10, F02D13/02, F02D23/02, F02B1/12 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
F02B23/10 (EP,US);
F02D41/3041 (EP,US);
F02D13/02 (US);
F02D23/02 (US);
F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
F02D41/0057 (EP,US);
F02D41/006 (EP,US);
F02D41/0065 (EP,US);
F02D41/2454 (US);
F02D41/2467 (US);
F02D41/30 (US);
B60K6/24 (US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US);
F02B1/12 (EP,US);
F02D2200/101 (EP,US);
F02D41/3047 (EP,US);
F02D45/00 (US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/52] | F02D45/00, F02B23/10, F02D13/02, F02D23/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTOR | [2021/07] | English: | ENGINE | [2021/07] | French: | MOTEUR | [2021/07] |
Former [2018/52] | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MOTOR | ||
Former [2018/52] | CONTROL APPARATUS FOR ENGINE | ||
Former [2018/52] | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2018 | Translation filed | 20.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 20.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2017 | AL | 16.06.2021 | AT | 16.06.2021 | CY | 16.06.2021 | CZ | 16.06.2021 | DK | 16.06.2021 | EE | 16.06.2021 | ES | 16.06.2021 | FI | 16.06.2021 | HR | 16.06.2021 | IT | 16.06.2021 | LT | 16.06.2021 | LV | 16.06.2021 | MC | 16.06.2021 | MK | 16.06.2021 | MT | 16.06.2021 | NL | 16.06.2021 | PL | 16.06.2021 | RO | 16.06.2021 | RS | 16.06.2021 | SE | 16.06.2021 | SI | 16.06.2021 | SK | 16.06.2021 | SM | 16.06.2021 | IE | 25.08.2021 | LU | 25.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | FR | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | BG | 16.09.2021 | GB | 16.09.2021 | NO | 16.09.2021 | GR | 17.09.2021 | IS | 16.10.2021 | PT | 18.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 25.08.2017 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
MK | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 25.08.2017 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6293246 (TANAHASHI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [XY]US2002059914 (YAMAGUCHI KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,14 * paragraphs [0075] - [0089] * [Y] 9-11,13; | [X]JP2003049691 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,2,9-14 * paragraphs [0034] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0052] *; | [A]JP2007205181 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [X]US2015053171 (SASAKI SHIZUO [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [Y] - OLESKY LAURA MANOFSKY ET AL, "The effects of diluent composition on the rates of HCCI and spark assisted compression ignition combustion", APPLIED ENERGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, GB, (20140327), vol. 124, doi:10.1016/J.APENERGY.2014.03.015, ISSN 0306-2619, pages 186 - 198, XP028640897 [Y] 9-11,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apenergy.2014.03.015 | International search | [Y]JPH09317520 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1-13 * , abstract; paragraphs [0033] to [0093]; fig. 12, 14 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2000064876 (AVL LIST GMBH) [Y] 12-13 * , paragraph [0017]; fig. 1 to 3 & US 6213086 B1 column 4, lines 24 to 28; fig. 1 to 3 & DE 19927479 A1 *; | [Y]JP2004036538 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0100] to [0101]; fig. 13 & US 2005/0155344 A1 paragraphs [0139] to [0140]; fig. 13 & US 2007/0039588 A1 & EP 1378644 A2 *; | [Y]JP2005105944 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [Y] 12-13* , abstract; claims 1 to 6; paragraphs [0030] to [0037]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2006283636 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-13 * , abstract; paragraphs [0028] to [0120]; fig. 1 to 21 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP4082292B (Mazda Motor Corp.) [Y] 1-13 * , claims 1 to 4; paragraphs [0001] to [0055]; fig. 1 to 8 & US 2005/0016496 A1 claims 1 to 4; paragraphs [0111] to [0148]; fig. 1 to 8 & EP 1484491 A2 *; | [Y]JP2015063937 (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0091]; fig. 1 to 9 & US 2015/0083072 A1 paragraphs [0001] to [0098]; fig. 1 to 9 & DE 102014013884 A1 & CN 104454194 A *; | [Y]JP2015098800 (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0023] to [0096]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP4082292B |