EP3458982 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DIGITAL IDENTITY MANAGEMENT AND PERMISSION CONTROLS WITHIN DISTRIBUTED NETWORK NODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northern Trust Corporation 50 South Lasalle Street Chicago, IL 60603 / US | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CZUPEK, Andrew 50 South Lasalle Street Chicago, IL 60603 / US | 02 /
MONKS, Andrew 50 South Lasalle Street Chicago, IL 60603 / US | 03 /
STEVENS, Anthony 50 South Lasalle Street Chicago, IL 60603 / US | 04 /
DAS, Arijit 50 South Lasalle Street Chicago, IL 60603 / US | 05 /
PRICE, Christopher 50 South Lasalle Street Chicago, IL 60603 / US | 06 /
CHAPMAN, Justin 50 South Lasalle Street Chicago, IL 60603 / US | 07 /
HANNAWAY, Wayne 50 South Lasalle Street Chicago, IL 60603 / US | 08 /
SMITH, Zabrina 50 South Lasalle Street Chicago, IL 60603 / US | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 17875067.5 | 19.12.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017US67171 | Priority number, date | US201762455471P | 06.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762455471 P | US201715845662 | 18.12.2017 Original published format: US201715845662 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144150 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458982 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3458982 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, G06F21/60, G06F21/64, H04L9/32, H04L29/06 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
H04L9/3226 (US);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06F21/604 (EP,US);
G06F21/64 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/0861 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04L9/3231 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/13] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER DIGITALEN IDENTITÄT UND ERLAUBNISSTEUERUNG INNERHALB VON VERTEILTEN NETZWERKKNOTEN | [2019/13] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DIGITAL IDENTITY MANAGEMENT AND PERMISSION CONTROLS WITHIN DISTRIBUTED NETWORK NODES | [2019/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION D'IDENTITÉ NUMÉRIQUE ET DE COMMANDE D'AUTORISATION DANS DES N UDS DE RÉSEAU DISTRIBUÉ | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 18.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2017 | AL | 17.06.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | TR | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | FR | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.12.2017 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MT | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
TR | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006123243 (SHIMOSATO HIDETO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0008] - [0016] - [ 134] - [0135] - [ 150] - [0155]; figures 4, 6 *; | [Y]US2010205660 (GRIFFIN PHILLIP H [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0 17] - [0018]; figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US2015096000 (SHARIF TARIQ [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0 18] , [0 21] , [0 23] , [0 30] - [0031] - [0 37] - [0043] - [0 45] - [0050] - [0 53] , [0 60] , [0 71]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2015095999 (TOTH KALMAN CSABA [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] , [ 112] , [ 114] , [ 131] - [0132] - [ 409] - [0410] - [ 462] - [0463] *; | [Y]US2015128240 (RICHARDS RONALD F [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] - [0 64] - [0065] - [0 71] , [0 73] , [0 77] , [0 92] *; | [A]EP3073670 (BGC INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] - [0 98] - [0104]; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2016328713 (EBRAHIMI ARMIN [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0009] - [0 21] - [0029] - [0 36] - [0039] - [0 40] - [0041] - [0 50]; figures 1A, 2A * | International search | [Y]US2015096000 (SHARIF TARIQ [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document (especially para [0018], [0021], [0022], [0029], [0041]-[0049], [0053]) *; | [Y]US2015095999 (TOTH KALMAN CSABA [US]) [Y] 1-20 * (para [0034], [0112], [0114], [0131][0132], [0409]-[0410], [0462]-[0463]) *; | [Y]US2015128240 (RICHARDS RONALD F [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * (para [0073], [0077], [0092]) *; | [Y] - SWAN M. BLOCKCHAIN, "Blueprint for a new economy", vol. 16, no. 17, (20150124), pages 24 - 25 , 62, URL: http://w2.blockchain-tec.net/blockchain/blockchain-by-melanie-swan.pdf, (20180226), XP055279098 [Y] 8 and 18 | by applicant | US2010205660 | US2015096000 | US2015128240 | US2016328713 |