EP3549839 - AUTONOMOUS DRIVING CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYUNDAI AUTOEVER CORP. 510, Teheran-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | [2021/51] |
Former [2019/41] | For all designated states Hyundai Mnsoft, Inc. Hyundai Motor Company 74 Wonhyo-ro Yongsan-gu Seoul 04365 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Wang Geon 104-1203 59 Dorim-ro Guro-gu Seoul 08313 / KR | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 17875158.2 | 28.11.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017KR13708 | Priority number, date | KR20160161365 | 30.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160161365 | [2019/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018101709 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549839 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3549839 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/14, B60W30/08, B60W40/06, B60W30/16, B60W30/10, B60W30/18 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
B60W30/10 (EP);
B60W60/001 (KR,US);
B60W60/0016 (US);
B60W30/08 (EP,KR);
B60W30/0956 (US);
B60W30/14 (EP);
B60W30/16 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/18163 (EP);
B60W40/06 (EP,KR);
G05D1/0246 (US);
G05D1/0276 (US);
B60W2420/403 (EP,US);
B60W2420/408 (EP,US);
B60W2552/00 (EP);
B60W2552/10 (KR,US);
B60W2552/50 (KR);
B60W2554/00 (US);
B60W2554/20 (US);
B60W2554/4041 (US);
B60W2554/802 (US);
B60W2556/10 (EP,US);
B60W2556/45 (EP);
B60W2556/65 (EP);
B60W2754/30 (KR);
B60W30/09 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | B60W30/14, B60W30/08, B60W40/06, B60W30/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN FÜR AUTONOMES FAHREN | [2019/41] | English: | AUTONOMOUS DRIVING CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2019/41] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CONDUITE AUTONOME | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2019 | Translation filed | 27.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 18.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2023 | CZ | 17.05.2023 | DK | 17.05.2023 | EE | 17.05.2023 | ES | 17.05.2023 | FI | 17.05.2023 | HR | 17.05.2023 | LT | 17.05.2023 | LV | 17.05.2023 | NL | 17.05.2023 | PL | 17.05.2023 | RO | 17.05.2023 | RS | 17.05.2023 | SE | 17.05.2023 | SK | 17.05.2023 | SM | 17.05.2023 | NO | 17.08.2023 | GR | 18.08.2023 | IS | 17.09.2023 | PT | 18.09.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
PT | 18.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010238283 (KIM CHEOL HO [KR]) [Y] 1-7,10-14 * paragraphs [0010] - [0016] - [ 0034] - [0048] *; | [Y]US2015039156 (SHIBATA TAKEO [JP]) [Y] 1-7,10-14* paragraphs [0033] - [0086] *; | [XAI]DE102014222058 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,11 * paragraphs [0004] - [0015] - [ 0029] - [0033] * * claims 1-3 * [A] 8,9,15 [I] 2,4-7,10,12-14 | International search | [A]JP2007008281 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0063]; and figures 1-11. *; | [A]JP2007122578 (EQUOS RES CO LTD) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0012]-[0067]; and figures 2-5. *; | [YA]KR20100104495 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7, 10-18 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0020]; and figure 2. * [A] 8-9, 19-20; | [Y]JP2013184563 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [Y] 1-7, 10-18 * See paragraphs [0008]-[0063]; and figures 2, 5-6. *; | [A]KR101502511B (HYUNDAI MOBIS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0110]; and figures 1-1 2. * | by applicant | KR19980068399 |