EP3548691 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND HOLDER FOR MOUNTING OF A DRILL BIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epiroc Rock Drills Aktiebolag 701 91 Örebro / SE | [2023/23] |
Former [2019/41] | For all designated states Epiroc Rock Drills Aktiebolag 701 91 Örebro / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGBLOM, Johan Skärmarboda 304 713 91 Nora / SE | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Epiroc Rock Drills AB Patents 701 91 Örebro / SE | [2023/23] |
Former [2019/41] | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 17875615.1 | 31.10.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017SE51073 | Priority number, date | SE20160051565 | 29.11.2016 Original published format: SE 1651565 | [2019/41] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018101870 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3548691 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3548691 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/18, E21B19/14, E21B12/00, E21B7/02 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
E21B7/025 (EP);
E21B12/00 (EP);
E21B19/14 (SE);
E21B19/18 (EP,RU,SE)
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | E21B19/18, E21B19/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND HALTER ZUR MONTAGE EINES BOHRMEISSELS | [2019/41] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND HOLDER FOR MOUNTING OF A DRILL BIT | [2019/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN DESTINÉS AU MONTAGE D'UN TRÉPAN | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2019 | Translation filed | 04.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 13.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | GB | 31.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
GB | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3976149 (GRANHOLM SVEN, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 1, lines 7-11, 51-56; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 23-29 * * column 3, lines 4-17 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 3 *; | [A]WO2009156575 (SANDVIK MINING & CONSTR OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-8* figures 1, 3 *; | [XP]EP3153654 (SANDVIK MINING & CONSTRUCTION OY [FI]) [XP] 1-3,5-8 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 14] , [0 21]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [XA]US3976149 (GRANHOLM SVEN, et al); | [A]WO0061907 (SANDVIK TAMROCK OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO2008054302 (ATLAS COPCO ROCK DRILLS AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2009156575 (SANDVIK MINING & CONSTR OY [FI], et al); | [E]EP3153654 (SANDVIK MINING & CONSTRUCTION OY [FI]) | by applicant | US3976149 |