EP3550292 - X-RAY REFLECTOMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigaku Corporation 9-12, Matsubara-cho 3-chome Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-8666 / JP | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Satoshi c/o Osaka Branch RIGAKU CORPORATION 14-8 Akaoji-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1146 / JP | 02 /
OMOTE, Kazuhiko c/o Tokyo Branch RIGAKU CORPORATION 9-12 Matsubara-cho 3-chome Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-8666 / JP | 03 /
KIKUTA, Shinya c/o Osaka Branch RIGAKU CORPORATION 14-8 Akaoji-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1146 / JP | 04 /
IKESHITA, Akihiro c/o Osaka Branch RIGAKU CORPORATION 14-8 Akaoji-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1146 / JP | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Wetterkreuz 3 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 17876115.1 | 14.11.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017JP40880 | Priority number, date | JP20160231401 | 29.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016231401 | [2019/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018101023 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3550292 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3550292 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/20, G01B15/02 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
G01B15/02 (EP,US);
G01N23/20008 (KR,US);
G01N23/20 (EP,US);
G01N23/201 (KR);
G01N2223/052 (EP,KR);
G01N2223/054 (KR);
G01N2223/1016 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | G01N23/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÖNTGENREFLEKTOMETER | [2019/41] | English: | X-RAY REFLECTOMETER | [2019/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE RÉFLECTIVITÉ DE RAYONS X | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2019 | Translation filed | 22.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 03.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2017 | AL | 27.10.2021 | AT | 27.10.2021 | CY | 27.10.2021 | CZ | 27.10.2021 | DK | 27.10.2021 | EE | 27.10.2021 | ES | 27.10.2021 | FI | 27.10.2021 | HR | 27.10.2021 | IT | 27.10.2021 | LT | 27.10.2021 | LV | 27.10.2021 | MC | 27.10.2021 | MK | 27.10.2021 | MT | 27.10.2021 | NL | 27.10.2021 | PL | 27.10.2021 | RO | 27.10.2021 | RS | 27.10.2021 | SE | 27.10.2021 | SI | 27.10.2021 | SK | 27.10.2021 | SM | 27.10.2021 | IE | 14.11.2021 | LU | 14.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | FR | 27.12.2021 | BG | 27.01.2022 | GB | 27.01.2022 | NO | 27.01.2022 | GR | 28.01.2022 | IS | 27.02.2022 | PT | 28.02.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 14.11.2017 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
MK | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.11.2021 | ||
LU | 14.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 27.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GB | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HU | 14.11.2017 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.11.2021 | ||
LU | 14.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 27.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GB | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 14.11.2017 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.11.2021 | ||
LU | 14.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 27.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GB | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.11.2021 | ||
LU | 14.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 27.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GB | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.11.2021 | ||
LU | 14.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 27.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GB | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.11.2021 | ||
LU | 14.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 27.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GB | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.11.2021 | ||
LU | 14.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GB | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.11.2021 | ||
LU | 14.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GB | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
LU | 14.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GB | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
LU | 14.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
LU | 14.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 27.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US7113566 (PELED ASHER [IL], et al) [X] 1 * column 4 - column 6; figures 1,2 * [A] 6,7 [Y] 3-5 [I] 2,8-10; | [Y]US2004131151 (BERMAN DAVID [IL], et al) [Y] 3 * claim 6 *; | [Y] - KLAUS HASCHE ET AL, "Metrological characterization of nanometer film thickness standards for XRR and ellipsometry applications", SPIE - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING. PROCEEDINGS, US, (20031120), vol. 5190, doi:10.1117/12.512216, ISSN 0277-786X, ISBN 978-1-5106-3549-4, page 165, XP055717463 [Y] 4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.512216 | [Y] - MIHO YASADA, "X-ray thin-film measurement techniques V. X-ray reflectivity measurement", THE RIGAKU JOURNAL, (2010), vol. 26, no. 2, XP055717481 [Y] 5 * page 4 * | International search | [A]JP2007024894 (JORDAN VALLEY SEMICONDUCTORS) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings & US 7113566 B1 (whole document) &KR10-2007-0009479A&TW200712482 A *; | [A]JPH10185846 (TECHNOS KENKYUSHO KK) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings & US 5949847 A (whole document) *; | [A]JP2002365242 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2005265742 | JP2004191376 |