EP3549148 - COMPOSITE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fastcap Systems Corporation 7 Audubon Road, Suite 100 Wakefield, MA 01880 / US | [2023/35] |
Former [2019/41] | For all designated states FastCAP Systems Corporation 21 Drydock Avenue, 8th Floor East Boston, MA 02210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAMBILLA, Nicolò, Michele 924 Beacon Street Apt. 2 Boston, MA 02215 / US | 02 /
MARTINI, Fabrizio 249 K Street Unit B Boston, MA 02127 / US | 03 /
RICH, Daniel 540 Memorial Drive Apt. 1101 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/41] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds West Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 17876365.2 | 01.12.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017US64152 | Priority number, date | US201662429727P | 02.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662429727 P | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018102652 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549148 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01G11/24, H01G11/28, H01G11/32, H01G11/36, H01G11/38, H01G11/70, H01G11/86, H01M4/62, H01M4/133, H01M4/583, // H01G11/26, H01M4/04 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H01G11/36 (EP,KR,US);
H01G11/24 (EP);
H01G11/28 (EP,US);
H01G11/32 (EP,US);
H01G11/38 (EP);
H01G11/70 (EP);
H01G11/86 (EP,KR);
H01M4/133 (EP);
H01M4/583 (EP);
H01M4/625 (EP);
H01M4/64 (US);
H01G11/26 (EP);
H01M4/043 (EP);
H01M4/0471 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/13 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/31] | H01G11/24, H01G11/28, H01G11/32, H01G11/36, H01G11/38, H01G11/70, H01G11/86, H01M4/62, // H01G11/26 | ||
Former IPC [2019/41] | H01G11/36, H01G11/86 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | VERBUNDELEKTRODE | [2019/41] | English: | COMPOSITE ELECTRODE | [2019/41] | French: | ELECTRODE COMPOSITE | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 25.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP23184852.4 / EP4243122 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101794671 (SUPREME POWER SYSTEMS CO LTD); | [A]US2011111279 (SMITHYMAN JESSE [US], et al); | [A]US2011157773 (SASAKI TOMOKAZU [JP]); | [A]FR2989821 (THALES SA [FR]); | [A]JP2015229741 (NIPPON ZEON CO) | International search | [A]US2010178543 (GRUNER GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * See paragraphs [0057]-[0065] and figure 1. *; | [X]US2011013344 (REMIZOV SERGEY [KR], et al) [X] 1-34 * See paragraphs [0005]-[0012], [0039]-[0083] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2011293850 (YI DONG KEE [KR], et al) [A] 1-34* See paragraphs [0034]-[0044] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2016012979 (ZHENG JIAN-PING [US]) [A] 1-34 * See paragraphs [0047]-[0059] and figures 2A-2B. *; | [A]US2016104891 (HOLME TIMOTHY [US]) [A] 1-34 * See paragraphs [0047]-[0050] and figure 1. * | by applicant | US2011111279 |