EP3552195 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING OCCUPANCY AT EACH OF A PLURALITY OF LOCATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rumbo Mobile Inc. 4230 Pierre-de-Coubertin App. 20 Montréal, Québec H1V 1A4 / CA | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORRES, German 4230 Pierre-de-Coubertin App. 20 Montréal, Québec H1V 1A4 / CA | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2019/42] | Berggren Oy, Tampere Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 17877440.2 | 08.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017CA51487 | Priority number, date | US201662432205P | 09.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662432205 P | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018102929 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3552195 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/14, G08B21/18, H04W4/38, G01S15/88, G01W1/14, G08B25/08, G08B25/10, H04N5/33, H04W4/00 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
G01S15/04 (EP,US);
G08G1/14 (EP,US);
G01S15/88 (EP);
G06V20/59 (US);
G08B21/18 (EP);
G08G1/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER BELEGUNG AN JEDEM VON MEHREREN ORTEN | [2019/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING OCCUPANCY AT EACH OF A PLURALITY OF LOCATIONS | [2019/42] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'OCCUPATION À CHAQUE EMPLACEMENT D'UNE PLURALITÉ D'EMPLACEMENTS | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 23.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/31] | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014210646 (SUBRAMANYA BALU [US]) [I] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0052] - [0 60] , [0061] , [0068] , [0113] - [0116] - [0148] *; | [I]US2010007525 (SHANBHAG AMIT UMESH [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4-6,8-10,12-15 * figures 1,2,13,14 * * paragraphs [0069] - [0075] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] * * paragraphs [0045] , [0046] *; | [A]WO2014147524 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0132] - [0137] * | International search | [XY]WO2012154913 (DUNCAN SOLUTIONS INC [US], et al) [X] 31 & 32 *Fig.(s) 1 - 5, 19, & 20 and para.(s) [0055] - [0071], [0107] - [0112], [0151], & [0152]* *Fig.(s) 1 - 5, 19, & 20 and para.(s) [0055] - [0071], [0107] - [0112], [0151], & [0152]* [Y] 1, 3, 6, 19-22, 39-41, & 43; | [Y]US6078272 (JACOBS JAMES P [US], et al) [Y] 1, 3, 6, & 19-21 *Fig. 1 & and col. 7, lines 29 - 37*; | [Y]US7714742 (NOWOROLSKI JAN MARK [US], et al) [Y] 22 & 39-41, & 43 *Fig. 4 and col. 6 lines 20 - 26*; | [A]US2011276370 (AGRAIT REBECCA E [US], et al) [A] 1-43; | [A]US2014005961 (HOD ARIE [CA], et al) [A] 1-43 |