EP3553997 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, SERVER DEVICE, USER DEVICE, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTI, Inc. 7-4 Matsutera 3-chome Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8021 / JP | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Takatoshi c/o NTI Inc. 7-4 Matsutera 3-chome Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8021 / JP | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/42] | Application number, filing date | 17877869.2 | 06.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017JP43764 | Priority number, date | JP20160236509 | 06.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016236509 | [2019/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018105638 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3553997 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L9/14 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
H04L9/083 (EP);
H04L9/12 (US);
H04L9/08 (EP);
H04L9/0869 (US);
H04L9/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, SERVERVORRICHTUNG, BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2019/42] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, SERVER DEVICE, USER DEVICE, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2019/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF SERVEUR, DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2019 | Translation filed | 04.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 11.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1946479 (VODAFONE PLC [GB]); | [XI]JP2013236397 (NTI CORP); | International search | [Y]JP2004080663 (ABEL SYSTEMS INC) [Y] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0058], [0062]-[0066], fig. 15-18 (Family: None) *; | [Y]US2008292105 (WAN CHIEH-YIH [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 7-14 * , paragraphs [0043]-[0051], fig. 5 & US 2012/0008787 A1 *; | [Y]JP2009253650 (CRYPT LAB INC N) [Y] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0037]-[0045] & US 2011/0305334 A1, paragraphs [0132]-[0204] & US 2015/0067324 A1 & WO 2009/123366 A1 & EP 2267937 A1 & TW 201014312 A *; | [Y] - MENEZES, A. et al., "key management techniques", MENEZES, A. et al., Menezes A J; Van Oorschot P C; Vanstone S A, Handbook of Applied Cryptography, Chapter 13: Key Management Techniques, Handbook of Applied Cryptography, pages 546 - 547, XP002676635 [Y] 4-6 | by applicant | JP2009177684 |