EP3551241 - ANTIMICROBIAL SHAPE MEMORY POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Texas A&M University System 3369 TAMU College Station, TX 77843-3369 / US | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONROE, Mary Beth 1012 Madera Circle College Station, Texas 77840 / US | 02 /
MAITLAND, Duncan J. 3489 Navajo Ridge Drive College Station, Texas 77845 / US | 03 /
WEEMS, Andrew 1240 Olde Oaks Drive Johnson City, Tennessee 37615 / US | 04 /
KELLER, Brandis 4000 Windowmere Street Bryan, Texas 77802 / US | 05 /
FLETCHER, Grace 3710 Blue Bonnet Boulevard Houston, Texas 77025 / US | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2019/42] | Application number, filing date | 17877973.2 | 06.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017US64852 | Priority number, date | US201662430620P | 06.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662430620 P | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018106775 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3551241 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3551241 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/54, A61L27/18, A61L27/56, A61L15/44, A61L15/42, A61L15/26 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
A61L24/0015 (EP,US);
A61L15/26 (EP,US);
A61L15/42 (EP,US);
A61L15/425 (EP,US);
A61L15/44 (EP);
A61L15/46 (US);
A61L24/001 (EP,US);
A61L24/0036 (EP,US);
A61L24/046 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61L31/14 (EP,US);
A61L31/146 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (US);
C08G18/73 (US);
C08G18/831 (US);
C08J9/36 (US);
A61L2300/104 (EP);
A61L2300/21 (EP);
A61L2300/216 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
A61L2300/442 (EP);
A61L2400/04 (US);
A61L2400/16 (EP,US);
A61L2430/02 (EP);
A61L2430/36 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L15/26, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
A61L24/046, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
A61L27/18, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
A61L31/06, C08L75/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE FORMGEDÄCHTNISPOLYMERE | [2019/42] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL SHAPE MEMORY POLYMERS | [2019/42] | French: | POLYMÈRES À MÉMOIRE DE FORME ANTIMICROBIENS | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 09.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23151357.3 / EP4183426 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2023 | CZ | 18.01.2023 | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SE | 18.01.2023 | SI | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | PT | 18.05.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 18.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN104744664 ; | [XY]WO2004063088 (JTL CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,7,9,12,13 * page 2, lines 8-11, 23-26, 29, 30 * * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 6 * * claim 1 * [Y] 3,4,6,8,10,11,13-15; | [XY]WO2016149070 (L LIVERMORE NAT SECURITY LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0022] , [0023] , [0024] , [0028] - [0031] - [0044] , [0053] * * claims 1,2,5,6,14,18 * [Y] 3,4,6,8,10,11,13-15; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 78, Database accession no. 2015-526241, XP002799425 & CN104744664 A 20150701 (HANGZHOU AIYINMEI HOUSEHOLD FURNISHINGS) [X] 1,2,7,9,12,13 * abstract * [Y] 3,4,6,8,10,11,13-15 | [Y] - GI BYOUNG HWANG ET AL, "White light-activated antimicrobial surfaces: effect of nanoparticles type on activity", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY B, GB, (20160101), vol. 4, no. 12, doi:10.1039/C6TB00189K, ISSN 2050-750X, pages 2199 - 2207, XP055705560 [Y] 13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C6TB00189K | [Y] - PERNI STEFANO ET AL, "Antimicrobial properties of light-activated polyurethane containing indocyanine green.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (201101), Database accession no. NLM20008087, XP002799426 [Y] 13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0885328209352701 | [ ] - PERNI STEFANO ET AL, "Antimicrobial properties of light-activated polyurethane containing indocyanine green.", JOURNAL OF BIOMATERIALS APPLICATIONS JAN 2011, (201101), vol. 25, no. 5, ISSN 1530-8022, pages 387 - 400 | International search | [Y]US6294186 (BEERSE PETER WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 3, 4 * See claims 1-6. *; | [XYA]WO2016149070 (L LIVERMORE NAT SECURITY LLC [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 9 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0091]; claims 1-20; and figures 1-6(b). * [Y] 3, 4 [A] 11-14, 22, 23; | [Y] - SOVA, M., "Antioxidant and antimicrobial activities of cinnamic acid derivatives", Mini-Reviews in Medicinal Chemistry, (20120501), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 749 - 767, XP055491898 [Y] 3, 4 * See abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/138955712801264792 | [Y] - CHANWITHEESUK, A. et al., "Antimicrobial gallic acid from Caesalpinia mimosoides Lamk", Food Chemistry, (20070000), vol. 100, no. 3, pages 1044 - 1048, XP005852025 [Y] 3, 4 * See pages 1044-1048. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2005.11.008 | [A] - CHUNG, S. et al., "Antimicrobial nanostructured polyurethane scaffolds, Advances in Polyurethane Biomaterials", ELSEVIER SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (20160216), ISBN 978-0-08-100614-6, pages 503 - 521, XP9514989 [A] 1-4, 9, 11-14, 22, 23 * See pages 503-521. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-08-100614-6.00017-2 |