EP3553074 - VAP POLYPEPTIDE AND USE THEREOF IN PREPARATION OF DRUG FOR TARGETED DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF TUMOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fudan University No. 220 Handan Road Yangpu District Shanghai 200433 / CN | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Weiyue 826 Zhangheng Road Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
RAN, Danni 826 Zhangheng Road Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
MAO, Jiani 826 Zhangheng Road Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
XIE, Cao 826 Zhangheng Road Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Sweetinburgh, Mark Roger, et al Sweetinburgh & Windsor Churchill Court 3 Manor Royal Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/42] | Sweetinburgh, Mark Roger, et al Sweetinburgh & Windsor 3 Amberley Court Whitworth Road Crawley, West Sussex RH11 7XL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17878861.8 | 06.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017CN114796 | Priority number, date | CN201611115191 | 07.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611115191 | [2019/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018103660 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3553074 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, A61K38/08, A61K49/00, A61P35/00 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
A61K9/1075 (EP,CN);
C07K7/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K38/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/42 (US);
A61K31/64 (US);
A61K31/704 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K38/05 (EP);
A61K39/0011 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K47/42 (CN,KR);
A61K47/544 (KR);
A61K47/593 (KR);
A61K47/62 (EP);
A61K47/64 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6907 (EP);
A61K49/0021 (CN);
A61K49/0032 (EP);
A61K49/0043 (EP);
A61K49/0056 (EP,KR);
A61K49/085 (KR);
A61K49/14 (CN,KR,US);
A61K51/08 (CN);
A61K51/088 (KR);
A61K9/107 (KR,US);
A61K9/127 (KR,US);
A61K9/1271 (CN);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61K2121/00 (KR);
A61K2123/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Title | German: | VAP-POLYPEPTID UND VERWENDUNG DAVON IN DER HERSTELLUNG EINES ARZNEIMITTELS ZUR GEZIELTEN DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG EINES TUMORS | [2019/42] | English: | VAP POLYPEPTIDE AND USE THEREOF IN PREPARATION OF DRUG FOR TARGETED DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF TUMOR | [2019/42] | French: | POLYPEPTIDE VAP ET SON UTILISATION DANS LA PRÉPARATION D'UN MÉDICAMENT DESTINÉ AU DIAGNOSTIC ET AU TRAITEMENT CIBLÉS D'UNE TUMEUR | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2019 | Translation filed | 28.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 22.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - FORTUNATO FERRARA ET AL, "Targeted molecular-genetic imaging and ligand-directed therapy in aggressive variant prostate cancer", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20161024), vol. 113, no. 45, doi:10.1073/pnas.1615400113, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12786 - 12791, XP055688457 [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-13 * Title; Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1615400113 | [Y] - MIN LIU ET AL, "D-Peptides as Recognition Molecules and Therapeutic Agents", CHEMICAL RECORD, US, (20160603), vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.1002/tcr.201600005, ISSN 1527-8999, pages 1772 - 1786, XP055646515 [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/tcr.201600005 | [Y] - BO RAM KANG ET AL, "Cell surface GRP78 as a biomarker and target for suppressing glioma cells", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20161007), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep34922, XP055688588 [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-13 * Title; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep34922 | [IP] - RAN DANNI ET AL, "GRP78 enabled micelle-based glioma targeted drug delivery", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20170323), vol. 255, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2017.03.037, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 120 - 131, XP085032961 [IP] 1,2,4,6,8-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2017.03.037 |