EP3470382 - GLASS FIBER COMPOSITION AND GLASS FIBER AND COMPOSITE MATERIAL THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jushi Group Co., Ltd. 669 Wenhua Rd. (South) Jushi Science & Technology Building Tongxiang Economic Development Zone Tongxiang, Zhejiang 314500 / CN | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Guorong Jushi Science&Technology Building 669 Wenhua Road (South) Tongxiang Economic Development Zone Tongxiang Zhejiang 314500 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Lin Jushi Science&Technology Building 669 Wenhua Road (South) Tongxiang Economic Development Zone Tongxiang Zhejiang 314500 / CN | 03 /
XING, Wenzhong Jushi Science&Technology Building 669 Wenhua Road (South) Tongxiang Economic Development Zone Tongxiang Zhejiang 314500 / CN | 04 /
HONG, Xiucheng Jushi Science&Technology Building 669 Wenhua Road (South) Tongxiang Economic Development Zone Tongxiang Zhejiang 314500 / CN | 05 /
YAO, Zhonghua Jushi Science&Technology Building 669 Wenhua Road (South) Tongxiang Economic Development Zone Tongxiang Zhejiang 314500 / CN | [2019/18] |
Former [2019/16] | 01 /
CAO, Guorong Jushi Science & Technology Building 669 Wenhua Road (South), Tongxiang Economic Developement Zone Tongxiang City, Zhejiang 314500 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Lin Jushi Science & Technology Building 669 Wenhua Road (South), Tongxiang Economic Developement Zone Tongxiang City, Zhejiang 314500 / CN | |||
03 /
XING, Wenzhong Jushi Science & Technology Building 669 Wenhua Road (South), Tongxiang Economic Developement Zone Tongxiang City, Zhejiang 314500 / CN | |||
04 /
HONG, Xiucheng Jushi Science & Technology Building 669 Wenhua Road (South), Tongxiang Economic Developement Zone Tongxiang City, Zhejiang 314500 / CN | |||
05 /
YAO, Zhonghua Jushi Science & Technology Building 669 Wenhua Road (South), Tongxiang Economic Developement Zone Tongxiang City, Zhejiang 314500 / CN | Representative(s) | Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 17879657.9 | 21.11.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017CN112002 | Priority number, date | CN201710762134 | 30.08.2017 Original published format: CN201710762134 | [2019/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019041581 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3470382 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3470382 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3470382 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C03C13/00, C03C3/087, C03C13/04 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
C03C3/087 (EP,KR,US);
C03C13/006 (RU);
C03C13/00 (CN,KR,US);
C03C13/046 (EP);
C03C3/112 (US);
C03C2213/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/16] | C03C13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLASFASERZUSAMMENSETZUNG, GLASFASER SOWIE VERBUNDSTOFF DARAUS | [2019/16] | English: | GLASS FIBER COMPOSITION AND GLASS FIBER AND COMPOSITE MATERIAL THEREOF | [2019/16] | French: | COMPOSITION DE FIBRE DE VERRE, FIBRE DE VERRE ET MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE CORRESPONDANTS | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2018 | Translation filed | 20.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2018 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 16.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2022
05.10.2022
ADMISSIBLE Owens Corning Intellectual Capital, LLC One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, OH 43659 / US Opponent's representative Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2022/45] | 19.10.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.02.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | MT | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | LU | 21.11.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
LU | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
LU | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
LU | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | EE | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012087313 (AGY HOLDING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15* tables 1,2 *; | [I]WO2016165506 (JUSHI GROUP CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-15 * example A2; table 1A *; | [I]WO2016165531 (JUSHI GROUP CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-15 * example A7; table 1A *; | [A]WO2016165532 (JUSHI GROUP CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * table 1A *; | [A]WO2016165530 (JUSHI GROUP CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * table 1A *; | EP3406575 [ ] (JUSHI GROUP CO LTD [CN]); | EP3406576 [ ] (JUSHI GROUP CO LTD [CN]); | EP3409649 [ ] (JUSHI GROUP CO LTD [CN]); | EP3415474 [ ] (JUSHI GROUP CO LTD [CN]) | Opposition | US2007105701 | US2012163987 | US2015133284 | WO2016165531 | WO2016165506 | CN106082639 | US2016362327 | - Wallenberger, Et Al., "Fiberglass and Glass Technology", (20100101), XP055970180 |